Wright v. Iowa Great Lakes Area Chamber of Commerce et al
Plaintiff: John Q Wright
Defendant: Does 1-10, Blain R Andera, Iowa Great Lakes Area Chamber of Commerce, Andrea Schwark and Custom Creations
Case Number: 5:2019cv04004
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Iowa Great Lakes Area Chamber of Commerce (Sealey, Patrick)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Custom Creations (Novak, Matthew)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER ONLY granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Emily A Danchuk. Upon review of the motion and the certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. IT IS SO ORDERED that the motion for admission pro hac vice is granted. Attorney Emily A Danchuk is authorized to appear as counsel on behalf of Plaintiff John Q Wright. Signed by Clerk on 3/1/2019. (pac)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Emily A. Danchuk ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2884043) by Plaintiff John Q Wright (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing) (Danchuk, Emily)
February 27, 2019 Set Deadlines: Defendant, Iowa Great Lakes Area Chamber of Commerce's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 3/28/2019. (src)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury demand by Blain R Andera, Iowa Great Lakes Area Chamber of Commerce.(Sealey, Patrick) Modified on 2/27/2019 to edit text. (src)
February 14, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant, Custom Creations LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 3/15/2019. Action taken pursuant to answer being filed at #7 . (src)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Andrea Schwark.(Novak, Matthew)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Custom Creations.(Novak, Matthew)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by John Q Wright (Lundberg, Paul)
January 23, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff (d/b/a JQ Licensing LLC)'s LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 2/13/2019. (src)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM #1 Complaint by John Q Wright (Lundberg, Paul)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 form mailed to Register of Copyrights in Washington, D.C. (src)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline set for 2/22/2019. (src)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (src)
January 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. No conflicts identified with parties, plaintiffs attorney and MAR. (src)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2853261.), filed by John Q Wright. Scheduling Report due by 4/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copyright) (Lundberg, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Iowa Great Lakes Area Chamber of Commerce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blain R Andera
Represented By: Patrick L Sealey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Great Lakes Area Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: Patrick L Sealey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Schwark
Represented By: Matthew G Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custom Creations
Represented By: Matthew G Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Q Wright
Represented By: Paul D Lundberg
Represented By: Emily A Danchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?