Unverferth Mfg Co, Inc. v. Meridian Mfg, Inc

Plaintiff: Unverferth Mfg. Co., Inc. and Unverferth Mfg Co, Inc
Defendant: Meridian Mfg., Inc. and Meridian Mfg, Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv04005
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #12 Answer to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Meridian Mfg, Inc by Unverferth Mfg Co, Inc.(Hynds, Joseph) Modified text on 3/8/2019 (pac).
February 25, 2019 Filing 17 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Meridian Mfg, Inc (Johnson, R)
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE: Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Trademark mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (pac)
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE: Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (pac)
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Krob on behalf of Meridian Mfg, Inc. (Krob, Nicholas) (Main Document 14 replaced on 2/15/2019 to correct caption) (pac).
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Lee Kennedy on behalf of Meridian Mfg, Inc. (Kennedy, Jonathan) (Main Document 13 replaced on 2/15/2019 to correct caption) (pac).
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Unverferth Mfg Co, Inc by Meridian Mfg, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 8,292,065, #2 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 6,964,551, #3 Exhibit U.S. Trademark Registration No. 2,377,005, #4 Exhibit Notice of Acceptance)(Johnson, R)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 , #8 and #10 pro hac vice motions. Attorneys Jenny L Colgate, Brett A Postal, and Joseph A Hynds are authorized to appear on behalf of plaintiff Unverferth Mfg. Co. Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 2/5/2019. (src)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph A. Hynds ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2858953) by Plaintiff Unverferth Mfg. Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing) (Dee, Michael)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF of Service by Unverferth Mfg. Co., Inc. Meridian Mfg., Inc. served on 1/24/2019. (Dee, Michael) Modified text on 1/29/2019 (pac).
January 25, 2019 Set Fee Date Deadline: $100 Pro Hac Vice fee for Attorney Joseph A Hynds due by 2/7/2019. (pac)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brett A. Postal ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2856632) by Plaintiff Unverferth Mfg. Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Dee, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2019: #2 Updated Certificate of Good Standing) (kfs).
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jenny L. Colgate ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2856627) by Plaintiff Unverferth Mfg. Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Dee, Michael)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph A. Hynds by Plaintiff Unverferth Mfg. Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Dee, Michael) Modified on 1/28/2019 attorney will refile and pay pro hac vice fee with pay.gov (des)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE: Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (pac) Modified text on 2/15/2019 (pac).
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Meridian Mfg., Inc.. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
January 24, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Unverferth Mfg. Co., Inc. (Dee, Michael)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Unverferth Mfg. Co., Inc. re #1 Complaint Exhibits Attached (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to Complaint, #2 Exhibit C to Complaint, #3 Exhibit D to Complaint, #4 Exhibit E to Complaint, #5 Exhibit F (part 1) to Complaint, #6 Exhibit F (part 2) to Complaint) (Dee, Michael)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Meridian Mfg., Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2855349), filed by Unverferth Mfg. Co., Inc. Scheduling Report Deadline 4/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dee, Michael) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (pac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unverferth Mfg Co, Inc. v. Meridian Mfg, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Mfg., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Mfg, Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Lee Kennedy
Represented By: R Scott Johnson
Represented By: Nicholas Krob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unverferth Mfg. Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael A Dee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unverferth Mfg Co, Inc
Represented By: Michael A Dee
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Hynds
Represented By: Jenny Colgate
Represented By: Brett A Postal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?