Risdal v. Cherokee City Chief of Police et al
Plaintiff: Eddie C Risdal
Defendant: Dave Jobes, Mike Adams, Anna C Salter and Cherokee City Chief of Police
Case Number: 5:2019cv04007
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 PRO SE RESPONSE filed by Eddie C Risdal to #9 Reply Brief re #7 Motion to Dismiss (nef and original document to non-ecf filer) (des)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF to re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Anna C Salter. (Kraemer, Gretchen)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 PRO SE RESISTANCE to #7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Eddie C Risdal (nef and original document to non-ecf filer) (des)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Anna C Salter (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Kraemer, Gretchen)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 PRO SE RESISTANCE to #3 Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Process filed by Eddie C Risdal. (NEF mailed to Pro Se Filer) (mmc)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anna C Salter. Anna C Salter waiver sent on 2/11/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Kraemer, Gretchen)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen Witte Kraemer on behalf of Anna C Salter. (Kraemer, Gretchen)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Process by Defendant Cherokee City Chief of Police. Responses due by 3/14/2019. (Hering, Barbara) Modified text on 3/1/2019 (skm).
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE of Service re #1 Pro Se Complaint by Eddie C Risdal. (NEF mailed to pro se filer) (mmc) Modified text on 2/14/2019 (skm).
February 5, 2019 FEE Receipt: $400.00, receipt number IAN550002124 for new civil case filing fee by Eddie C Risdal. NEF mailed to plaintiff. (src)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Eddie C Risdal. Dismissal Deadline 5/20/2019. (nef to non-ecf filer) (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Risdal v. Cherokee City Chief of Police et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Jobes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna C Salter
Represented By: Gretchen Witte Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee City Chief of Police
Represented By: Barbara A Hering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie C Risdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?