Hunter v. Randolf et al

Plaintiff: Civil Rights Center of South Dakota, All Unknown Named Citizens and Michael Hunter
Defendant: Sioux City Police, Officer Randolf and Sioux City, City of
Case Number: 5:2019cv04015
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
2 Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Dismissing Case - No action was taken in this case within the time provided in the Court's Order dated May 30th 2019. It is ordered that the plaintiff take nothing and that the action be dismissed. Signed by Clerk on 6/17/2019. Order/NEF mailed to plaintiff. (src)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Dismissal Pursuant to Local Rule 41(c). Unless appropriate action is taken by 6/13/2019, this action will be dismissed. Signed by Clerk on 5/30/2019. Notice, LR 41 and NEF mailed to plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 LR 41) (src)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 Pro Se Motion for Reconsideration of #3 Order. See Order text for details. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 4/30/2019. (Order/NEF mailed to Pltf) (mmc)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael Hunter which included #3 Order and #4 NEF. Remailed to 1360 - 33rd Ave, PMB 116, Columbus, NE 68601 (des)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 PRO SE MOTION For Reconsideration of #3 Order by Plaintiff Michael Hunter (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A) (nef to non-ecf filer) (des)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael Hunter which included NEFs for #2 Pro Se Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #1 Pro Se Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (des) Modified on 4/29/2019 to note remailed to 1360 - 33rd Ave, PMB 116, Columbus, NE 68601 (des)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Hunter. Dismissal Deadline 8/5/2019. (NEF mailed to Pro Se Pltf) (mmc)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The clerk's office is directed to file the complaint (Doc. No. #1 -1) as a new entry without the prepayment of the filing fee. Plaintiffs "Civil Rights Center of South Dakota" and "All Unknown Named Citizens" are hereby dismissed from this case, without prejudice. The clerk's office is directed to send plaintiff a copy of the standard 1983 form. Plaintiff is given thirty days from the date of this order to file a supplemental complaint. If plaintiff fails to file a supplemental complaint within thirty days, this case will be dismissed with no further order of the court. See Order text for details. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 4/22/2019. (Order/NEF/1983 form mailed to pro se pltf) (mmc)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Michael Hunter (filed as such pursuant to PSLC) (nef to pro se filer) (des)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Hunter (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Memorandum of Law) (filed as such pursuant to PSLC) (nef to pro se filer) (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Randolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sioux City Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Randolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sioux City, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Civil Rights Center of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Unknown Named Citizens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?