Tyson Foods, Inc v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Tyson Foods, Inc and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv04020
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyson Foods, Inc, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. United States of America served on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to USDA, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking Report) (Boatner, Ivan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyson Foods, Inc, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (Boatner, Ivan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyson Foods, Inc, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. United States of America served on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Boatner, Ivan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc (Boatner, Ivan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Tyson Foods, Inc (Boatner, Ivan)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ivan A Boatner on behalf of Plaintiff Tyson Foods Inc. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 5/20/2019. (des)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM to #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ivan A Boatner by Tyson Foods, Inc (des)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Savannah R Dabney on behalf of Plaintiff Tyson Foods Inc and Tyson Fresh Meats Inc. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 5/16/2019. (des)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ivan A. Boatner ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2940479) by Plaintiff Tyson Foods, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Boatner, Ivan)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Savannah R. Dabney ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2940431) by Plaintiff Tyson Foods, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Dabney, Savannah)
May 15, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 6/5/2019 (des)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
May 15, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Clerk checked for conflicts - none found. (des)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2939867.), filed by Tyson Foods, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 8/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Koob, Rosalynd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyson Foods, Inc v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyson Foods, Inc
Represented By: Rosalynd Jean Koob
Represented By: Ivan A Boatner
Represented By: Savannah R Dabney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc
Represented By: Rosalynd Jean Koob
Represented By: Savannah R Dabney
Represented By: Ivan A Boatner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?