Aceves v. Northwest Iowa Pork
Plaintiff: Luis Aceves
Defendant: Itoham America, Inc. and Northwest Iowa Pork
Case Number: 5:2019cv04030
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss Count II in case 5:19-cv-04030-LTS-KEM; granting (6) Motion to Dismiss Count II in case 5:19-cv-04032-LTS-KEM; granting (6) Motion to Dismiss Count II in case 5:19-cv-04033-LTS-KEM. These cases shall proceed with regard to Count I only. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 8/27/2019. Associated Cases: 5:19-cv-04030-LTS-KEM, 5:19-cv-04032-LTS-KEM, 5:19-cv-04033-LTS-KEM (des)
July 29, 2019 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. No conflicts identified. (kms)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Luis Aceves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (skm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Defendant's Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Northwest Iowa Pork (Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 DEFENDANTS Brief re #5 Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Brief in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Northwest Iowa Pork (Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Northwest Iowa Pork Responses due by 7/26/2019 Check Status on MJ Consent due by 7/26/2019. (Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Defendant's Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Northwest Iowa Pork (Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica) Modified text (wrong doc filed) on 7/12/2019 (kms).
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status by 8/11/2019. (skm)
July 12, 2019 Set Deadlines: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 8/2/2019. (skm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: Please find attached the Civil Removal Case Packet. (skm)
July 12, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Woodbury County, case number CVCV186888. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2977809), filed by Itoham America, Inc. Scheduling Report due by 9/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1) (Hoyme, Christopher) Modified text on 7/12/2019 (skm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aceves v. Northwest Iowa Pork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itoham America, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Kallstrom-Schreckengost
Represented By: Christopher E Hoyme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Iowa Pork
Represented By: Jessica Kallstrom-Schreckengost
Represented By: Christopher E Hoyme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Aceves
Represented By: Terry A White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?