Harvest International, Inc. v. Clean Seed Capital Group Ltd
Plaintiff: Harvest International, Inc. and Harvest International, Inc
Defendant: Clean Seed Capital Group Ltd
Case Number: 5:2019cv04035
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Harvest International, Inc (Johnson, R)
July 17, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 8/6/2019. (pac)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Clean Seed Capital Group Ltd. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
July 17, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Clean Seed Capital Group Ltd ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2980480.), filed by Harvest International, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 10/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvest International, Inc. v. Clean Seed Capital Group Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvest International, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Lee Kennedy
Represented By: R Scott Johnson
Represented By: Nicholas Krob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvest International, Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Lee Kennedy
Represented By: R Scott Johnson
Represented By: Nicholas Krob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Seed Capital Group Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?