Purvis v. Saul
Plaintiff: Allen William Purvis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2019cv04036
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Schunk on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Schunk, Jacob)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (jjh)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Allen William Purvis. Dismissal Deadline 10/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjh)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 7/19/2019. (jjh)
July 18, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. (des)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Allen William Purvis (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit proposed compaint) (Carter, Ruth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purvis v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen William Purvis
Represented By: Ruth M Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?