Powell v. United Rentals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Powell
Defendant: Dave Devorak, James Mott, United Rentals, Inc. and United Rentals, Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv04044
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated re #9 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. (src)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Dave Devorak, James Mott, United Rentals, Inc (Gray, John) Modified on 9/10/2019 to edit text. (src)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the #3 Motion for Leaveto Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karen Denney on behalf of Defendants United Rentals Inc, James Mott, and Dave Devorak. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 8/7/2019. NEF emailed to Attorney Denney. NEF mailed to plaintiff Powell. Check status Ddl set for 8/21/19 for submission of CM-ECF form. (src) (src).
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Michael Powell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) NEF mailed to filer. (src)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKET Annotation - Please find new removal case packet attached. Mailed to pro se plaintiff. (src)
August 7, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. NEF mailed to pro se plaintiff. (src)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM #1 Notice of Removal, by Dave Devorak, James Mott, United Rentals, Inc. (Gray, John) Modified on 8/7/2019 to note mailed to pro se plaintiff per KEM chambers. (src)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by United Rentals, Inc. (Gray, John) Modified on 8/7/2019 to note mailed to pro se plaintiff per KEM chambers. (src)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karen Denney ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2993820) by Defendants Dave Devorak, James Mott, United Rentals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Gray, John) Modified on 8/7/2019 to note copy mailed to pro se plaintiff per KEM chambers. (src)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) by Defendants Dave Devorak, James Mott, United Rentals, Inc. Responses due by 8/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Partially Dismiss, #2 Exhibit to Motion to Partially Dismiss) (Gray, John) Modified on 8/7/2019 to note that this has been mailed to pro se plaintiff per KEM chambers. (src)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Woodbury County District Court, case number LACV187222. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2993799), filed by United Rentals, Inc., Dave Devorak, James Mott. Scheduling Report due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits of Documents Filed in State Court) (Gray, John) Modified on 8/7/2019 to edit text and note that a copy of all documents was mailed to pro se plaintiff per KEM chambers. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. United Rentals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Devorak
Represented By: John C Gray
Represented By: Karen Denney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mott
Represented By: John C Gray
Represented By: Karen Denney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: John C Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Rentals, Inc
Represented By: John C Gray
Represented By: Karen Denney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?