GSL Holdings, S.A. de C.V. v. AALFS Family Partnership et al
Plaintiff: GSL Holdings, S.A. de C.V. and GSL Holdings, SA de CV
Defendant: James Alex Rodawig Trust, Aalfs Family Partnership, William Eric Rodawig Trust, Jon Andrew Rodawig Trust, Rodawig Family Ltd. Partnership and Rodawig Family Ltd Partnership
Case Number: 5:2019cv04047
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 MOTION to Stay filed by GSL Holdings, SA de CV. This case is hereby stayed pending arbitration. The parties shall promptly file a status report upon the conclusion of arbitration. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 9/25/2019. (src)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 UNRESISTED Motion for Stay Pending Arbitration by Plaintiff GSL Holdings, SA de CV (Craig, Jason)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by GSL Holdings, SA de CV identifying Other Affiliate Grupo Siete Leguas for GSL Holdings, SA de CV. (Craig, Jason)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by James Alex Rodawig Trust, AALFS Family Partnership, Jon Andrew Rodawig Trust, William Eric Rodawig Trust, and Rodawig Family Ltd Partnership. The deadline for Defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is extended to 10/8/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 9/3/2019. (pac)
August 30, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendants' LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 9/28/2019. (skm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Response Deadline by Defendants AALFS Family Partnership, James Alex Rodawig Trust, Jon Andrew Rodawig Trust, Rodawig Family Ltd. Partnership, William Eric Rodawig Trust (Lepp, Robert)
August 20, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 9/9/2019. (skm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (skm)
August 20, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3002165) filed by GSL Holdings, S.A. de C.V.. Scheduling Report deadline 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Craig, Jason) Modified on 8/19/2019. (src) Modified text on 8/20/2019 to correct scheduling report ddln (skm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GSL Holdings, S.A. de C.V. v. AALFS Family Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Alex Rodawig Trust
Represented By: Robert L Lepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aalfs Family Partnership
Represented By: Robert L Lepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Eric Rodawig Trust
Represented By: Robert L Lepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Andrew Rodawig Trust
Represented By: Robert L Lepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodawig Family Ltd. Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodawig Family Ltd Partnership
Represented By: Robert L Lepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GSL Holdings, S.A. de C.V.
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GSL Holdings, SA de CV
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?