Mathieson-Shantz v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Gayle Mathieson-Shantz
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 5:2019cv04050
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #8 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice (des)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America (Sarp, Paulette)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It has been brought to the court's attention that this matter has been settled by the parties and that no further proceedings are contemplated. Unless a stipulation of dismissal or request for an extension of time is filed by no later than thirty days from the date of this Order, this case will be dismissed with prejudice and all pending motions will be terminated. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 9/25/2019. (mmc)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Life Insurance Company of North America: Answer or responsive pleading due by 10/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 9/10/2019. (jjh)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time for Life Insurance Company of North America to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Petition by Life Insurance Company of North America (Sarp, Paulette) Modified text and changed to a motion on 9/10/2019 pursuant to direction from chambers. (mmc).
September 5, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 9/25/2019. (ksy)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET Annotation: Attached is a New ERISA case packet. (ksy)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Gayle Mathieson-Shantz (ksy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Life Insurance Company of North America re #1 Notice of Removal, (Sarp, Paulette)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court in and for Woodbury County, case number LACV187116. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3013414), filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Scheduling Report due by 11/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal) (Sarp, Paulette) Modified text on 9/5/2019 (ksy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathieson-Shantz v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Paulette S Sarp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Mathieson-Shantz
Represented By: Harold K Widdison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?