Treinen v. American Airlines, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jay Joseph Treinen
Defendant: Trego Dugan Aviation of Grand Island, Trego Dugan Aviation, Inc., American Airlines, Trego Dugan Aviation, Inc, American Airlines, Inc and Trego Dugan Aviation of Grand Island, Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv04062
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 11/19/2019 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 1/3/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 1/3/2020. Plaintiff's Expert Witness due by 2/28/2020. Defendants' Expert Witnesses due by 4/28/2020. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Experts due by 5/28/2020. Discovery due by 7/28/2020. Motions due by 8/28/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 2/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 11/22/2019. ORDER: Upon consent of the parties American Airlines, Inc, Trego Dugan Aviation of Grand Island, Inc, Trego Dugan Aviation, Inc, and Jay Joseph Treinen, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts for final disposition. Judge CJ Williams on 11/22/2019. (pac)
November 22, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Scheduling Conference held on 11/22/2019. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (pac)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* ORDER Resetting Hearings. Scheduling Conference reset for 11/21/2019 at 04:00 PM before United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Roberts. See Order at Doc. 12 for conference bridge information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Roberts on 11/19/2019. (Steele, Amy)
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 (FILED IN ERROR-NOT TO BE FILED) NOTICE by Jay Joseph Treinen of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosures (Sandy, John) Modified text and regenerated NEFs on 11/19/2019 (kms).
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 (FILED IN ERROR-NOT TO BE FILED) NOTICE by American Airlines, Inc, Trego Dugan Aviation of Grand Island, Inc, Trego Dugan Aviation, Inc of Service of Defendants' Rule 26 Disclosures (Rauterkus, Jerald) Modified text and regenerated NEFs on 11/19/2019 (kms).
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 02:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 11/12/2019. (jjh)
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement for Plaintiff, Jay Joseph Treinen by Jay Joseph Treinen (Sandy, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Trego Dugan Aviation of Grand Island, Inc, Trego Dugan Aviation, Inc (Rauterkus, Jerald) Modified text on 10/4/2019 (kms).
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by American Airlines, Inc (Rauterkus, Jerald) Modified text on 10/4/2019 (kms).
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jerald L. Rauterkus on behalf of Defendants American Airlines, Inc, Trego Dugan Aviation of Grand Island, Inc, Trego Dugan Aviation, Inc. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted on the condition attorney submits CM/ECF Registration Form by 10/16/2019. Signed by Clerk on 10/2/2019. (eAtty Rauterkus) (kms)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jerald L. Rauterkus ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3032665) by Defendants American Airlines, Inc, Trego Dugan Aviation of Grand Island, Inc, Trego Dugan Aviation, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Siems, Tiernan)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Trego Dugan Aviation of Grand Island, Inc, Trego Dugan Aviation, Inc.(Siems, Tiernan) Modified text on 9/30/2019 (kms).
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by American Airlines, Inc.(Siems, Tiernan) Modified text on 9/30/2019 (kms).
September 26, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 10/16/2019. (ksy) Modified on 9/30/2019 (ksy).
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET Annotation: Please find Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (des)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition and Jury Demand by Jay Joseph Treinen (des)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 10/25/2019. (des)
September 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (des)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Woodbury County, case number LACV188160. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3027100), filed by American Airlines, Trego Dugan Aviation, Inc., Trego Dugan Aviation of Grand Island. Scheduling Report due by 11/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Petition, #3 Proof of Svc American Airlines, #4 Proof of Svc Trego Dugan) (Siems, Tiernan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Treinen v. American Airlines, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trego Dugan Aviation of Grand Island
Represented By: Tiernan T Siems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trego Dugan Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: Tiernan T Siems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines
Represented By: Tiernan T Siems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trego Dugan Aviation, Inc
Represented By: Tiernan T Siems
Represented By: Jerald L Rauterkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc
Represented By: Tiernan T Siems
Represented By: Jerald L Rauterkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trego Dugan Aviation of Grand Island, Inc
Represented By: Tiernan T Siems
Represented By: Jerald L Rauterkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Joseph Treinen
Represented By: John Mandel Sandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?