Nunes v. Lizza et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Devin G Nunes
Defendant: Hearst Magazines, Inc and Ryan Lizza
Case Number: 5:2019cv04064
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven Scott Biss, on behalf of Plaintiff,Devin G Nunes. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 11/08/2019. NEF emailed to Attny Biss with link to CM-ECF sign up link. (src)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven Scott Biss, on behalf of Plaintiff,Devin G Nunes. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 11/08/2019. NEF emailed to Attny Biss with link to CM-ECF sign up link. (src)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven Scott Biss ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3057701) by Plaintiff Devin G Nunes (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Feller, Joseph)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hearst Magazines, Inc and Ryan Lizza. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: # 1 New Civil Case Packet) (src)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3031648.), filed by Devin G Nunes. Scheduling Report due by 12/30/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Feller, Joseph)
September 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. No conflicts identified with parties, and plaintiff's attorney. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunes v. Lizza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hearst Magazines, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Lizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin G Nunes
Represented By: Joseph M Feller
Represented By: Steven Scott Biss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?