Hansen's Inc v. Frank et al.
Plaintiff: Hansen's Inc
Defendant: Tidepool Media, Inc, Timothy Frank, Matthew Andrews, Emagine Marketing and Jarah Andrews
Case Number: 5:2019cv04069
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2019 10:00 AM (Telephonic Hearing - see text of Order for dial-in hearing participation instructions) before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan) (jag)
December 9, 2019 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney no longer assigned to the case as the presider. No conflicts identified. (des)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Tidepool Media, Inc (Wright, Jeff)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Emagine Marketing (Wright, Jeff)
November 8, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant Emagine Marketing's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 11/23/2019. Defendant Tidepool Media, Inc's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 11/27/2019. (pac)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER With Jury Demand to #1 Complaint, by Jarah Andrews, Matthew Andrews, Emagine Marketing, Timothy Frank, Tidepool Media, Inc.(Wright, Jeff)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Hansen's Inc (Osborn, Anthony)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hansen's Inc Timothy Frank (Osborn, Anthony) Modified text on 10/31/2019 (pac).
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hansen's Inc Tidepool (Osborn, Anthony)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hansen's Inc Matthew Andrews (Osborn, Anthony)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hansen's Inc Jarah Andrews (Osborn, Anthony)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Hansen's Inc. (Osborn, Anthony)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* granting #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Louis J Rouleau (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number 0862-3045677): Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. It is ordered that Attorney Louis J Rouleau is authorized to appear on behalf of Plaintiff Hansen's Inc (EFC Registration Form due by 11/5/2019). Signed by Clerk on 10/22/2019. (pac)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Louis J. Rouleau ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3045677) by Plaintiff Hansen's Inc (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing) (Osborn, Anthony)
October 16, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 11/6/2019. (pac)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jarah Andrews, Matthew Andrews, Emagine Marketing, Timothy Frank, Tidepool Media, Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 11/13/2019. (pac)
October 16, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3041428.), filed by Hansen's Inc. Scheduling Report due by 1/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Osborn, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen's Inc v. Frank et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tidepool Media, Inc
Represented By: Jeff W Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Frank
Represented By: Jeff W Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Andrews
Represented By: Jeff W Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emagine Marketing
Represented By: Jeff W Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarah Andrews
Represented By: Jeff W Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hansen's Inc
Represented By: Anthony Lee Osborn
Represented By: Louis J Rouleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?