Doe v. Dordt University et al--PER #5 ORDER SET #2 MOTION RESPONSE DDL FOR 2 WEEKS AFTER DEFTS FILE APPEARANCE
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Derek Buteyn, Howard Wilson, Dordt University, Erin Olson, Robert Taylor and Dordt University Board of Trustees
Case Number: 5:2019cv04082
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy K Davis on behalf of John Doe. (Davis, Amy)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe. All Defendants. (Levy, Adrienne)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: This matter is before the court on the #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adrienne Levy, #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew T. Miltenberg, and #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stuart Bernstein on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe. Upon a review of the Motions and the Certificates of Good Standing, the court finds the Motions should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 12/17/2019. (skm)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stuart Bernstein ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3085027) by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Davis, Amy)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew T. Miltenberg ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3085023) by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Davis, Amy)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adrienne Levy ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3085021) by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Davis, Amy)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #2 Motion to proceed under Pseudonym filed by Plaintiff John Doe. Plaintiffs request for ex parte relief is denied. The motion to proceed under pseudonym will be held in abeyance until Defendants enter their appearances in this case. Defendants will have two weeks after their entry of appearance to file a response to the motion. The case shall remain as filed, with Plaintiff appearing as John Doe, until the motion to proceed under pseudonym is decided. Defendants are prohibited from publicly identifying Plaintiff in court filings or otherwise pending resolution of the motion to proceed under pseudonym. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/9/2019. (des)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (kms)
December 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. No conflicts identified. (kms)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by John Doe of filing Motion to file Under Pseudonym Oral Argument Requested (Davis, Amy) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/5/2019) (ksy). Modified text on 12/6/2019 (kms).
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Motion File under Pseudonym by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Brief, #12 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Amy) Modified on 12/5/2019 (ksy). (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/5/2019) (ksy).
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3076264.), filed by John Doe. Scheduling Report due by 3/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Amy) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/5/2019) (ksy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Dordt University et al--PER #5 ORDER SET #2 MOTION RESPONSE DDL FOR 2 WEEKS AFTER DEFTS FILE APPEARANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Buteyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dordt University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dordt University Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Amy K Davis
Represented By: David Harris Goldman
Represented By: Andrew T Miltenberg
Represented By: Stuart Bernstein
Represented By: Adrienne D Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?