Shields v. The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Plaintiff: Adam Shields
Defendant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, The
Case Number: 5:2020cv04017
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 State Court Petition by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, The.(Sweeney, Coreen) Modified text on 4/20/2020 (skm).
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status by 4/15/2020. (skm)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Adam Shields (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (skm)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: Please find attached the new civil removal case packet. (skm)
March 16, 2020 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (conflicts checked; none found). (skm)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Coreen K Sweeney on behalf of The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Sweeney, Coreen)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc. for The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Duffy, Keith)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Woodbury County, case number LACV190749. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3160879), filed by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. Scheduling Report due by 5/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Original Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Acceptance of Service) (Duffy, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shields v. The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Shields
Represented By: Sean M Corpstein
Represented By: Adam D Zenor
Represented By: Michael Darrell Currie
Represented By: Matthew Sahag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, The
Represented By: Coreen K Sweeney
Represented By: Keith Patrick Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?