Hunter v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Michael Hunter
Defendant: Mitch McConnell, President of the U S Donald Trump, Andrew M Saul, Christopher Rhay, Lindsey Graham, Robert Paul Mueller and William Barr
Case Number: 5:2020cv04042
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 JUDGMENT in favor of Andrew M Saul, Christopher Rhay, Donald Trump, Lindsey Graham, Mitch McConnell, Robert Paul Mueller, William Barr against Michael Hunter Signed by Clerk on 8/26/2020. (mailed to Petitioner) (jjh)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 PRO SE SUPPLEMENT to #1 Pro Se Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with proposed Company by Petitioner Michael Hunter (filed as such pursuant to PSLC) (nef mailed to petitioner) (des)
August 24, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #3 Order. (NEF mailed to Petitioner) (jjh)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Pro Se Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerks office is directed to consider the petition (Doc. No. 1-1) docketed without the prepayment of fees. However, after an initial review, Hunter's petition is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). His remaining #2 motion is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 8/24/2020. (copy mailed to Petitioner) (jjh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE MOTION for Injunction by Petitioner Michael Hunter (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (filed as such pursuant to PSLC) (nef mailed to petitioner) (des)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Hunter (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (PSLC) (NEF mailed to Pltf) (jjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President of the U S Donald Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Rhay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Paul Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?