Britt v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Britt
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, Does 1-100 and CR Bard, Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv04044
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Western Division Office
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: The parties shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan due by 10/21/2020 in compliance with LR 16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 10/01/2020. (ksy)
September 4, 2020 Filing 36 TEXT ORDER ONLY granting #32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John S. Gearan on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard, Inc. Upon review of the motion and previous admission of this attorney in related cases, the court finds the motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 9/4/2020. (jag)
September 4, 2020 Filing 35 TEXT ORDER ONLY granting #31 #33 and #34 MOTIONS for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Darren P. McDowell, Steven S. Schulte, and Eric Martin Przybysz on behalf of Plaintiff Patricia Britt. Upon review of the Motions and the Certificates of Good Standing, the Motions are granted. However, with respect to Attorneys McDowell and Przybysz, the Motions are granted on the condition that they register for CM/ECF by 9/18/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/4/2020. (eAttys Przybysz and McDowell) (jag)
September 3, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric Przybysz by Plaintiff Patricia Britt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - State Bar of Texas) (Schulte, Steve)
September 3, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Darren McDowell by Plaintiff Patricia Britt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - State Bar of Texas) (Schulte, Steve)
September 3, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John S. Gearan by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard, Inc (Gearan, John)
September 3, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven S. Schulte by Plaintiff Patricia Britt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - State Bar of Texas) (Schulte, Steve)
September 3, 2020 Filing 30 TEXT ORDER ONLY granting #29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Noah Lindenfeld on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard, Inc. ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3278892). Upon review of the motion and previous admission of this attorney in related cases, the court finds the motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 9/3/2020. (jag)
September 3, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Noah Lindenfeld ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3278892) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard, Inc (Lindenfeld, Noah)
September 1, 2020 Filing 28 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation to Dismiss Claims Against McKesson Corporation Without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard, Inc, McKesson Corporation (Lederer, Gregory)
September 1, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews; Jordan E Jarreau and Jessica Junek on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard, Inc, McKesson Corporation (Lederer, Gregory)
September 1, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M Lederer on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard, Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Lederer, Gregory)
August 20, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE to Attorneys Not Admitted to Practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa (eAttys) (des) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2020: #1 Receipt Confirmations) (des).
August 20, 2020 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02342. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE Modified on 8/20/2020 (des)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Patricia Britt's case be severed and transferred to the Sioux City Division of the Northern District of Iowa (Civil case 3:20-cv-2342-S opened); b. Plaintiff Jessica Burge's case be severed and transferred to the Hattiesburg Division of the Southern District of Mississippi (Civil case 3:20-cv-2343-S opened); c. Plaintiff Lori Finn's case be severed and transferred to the Rochester Division of the Western District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2344-S opened); d. Plaintiff Joseph Ingram's case be severed and transferred to the Jackson Division of the Southern District of Mississippi (Civil case 3:20-cv-2345-S opened); e. Plaintiff James Jones's case be severed and transferred to the Richmond Division of the Eastern District of Virginia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2346-S opened); f. Plaintiff Barbara Lawrence's case be severed and transferred to the Detroit Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (Civil case 3:20-cv-2347-S opened); g. Plaintiff John Reeves's case be severed and transferred to the Springfield Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2349-S opened); h. Plaintiff Venette Terry's case be severed and transferred to the Bay City Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (Civil case 3:20-cv-2350-S opened); i. Plaintiff Quinten Wedge's case be severed and transferred to the Kansas City Division of the District of Kansas (Civil case 3:20-cv-2362-S opened). Plaintiff Catherine Simpson is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/19/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Completed Plaintiff Forms) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION to Extend Time Resp/Reply filed by Patricia Britt, Jessica Burge, Lori Finn, Joseph Ingram, James Jones, Barbara Lawrence, John Reeves, Catherine Simpson, Venette Terry, Quinten Wedge (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Przybysz, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 12 replaced to flatten image on 6/17/2020) (dsr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/12/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. re #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10905573) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 Citation Issued Bard Peripheral, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 Citation Issued C.R. Bard Inc., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 Citation Issued McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 Affidavit of Service McKinnson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 Return of Service - C. R. Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Britt v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: John S Gearan, III
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Represented By: Noah Lindenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard, Inc
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: John S Gearan, III
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Noah Lindenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Britt
Represented By: Steve Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren P McDowell
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?