Rose v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Beau Michael Rose
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2020cv04062
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beau Michael Rose. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/31/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (Forker, Wilford)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Schunk on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Schunk, Jacob)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Social Security Case Packet) (kms)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 1/29/2021. (kms)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3354732.), filed by Beau Michael Rose. Dismissal Deadline 4/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Forker, Wilford)
December 30, 2020 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. (No conflicts identified) (kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beau Michael Rose
Represented By: Wilford L Forker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?