Barto v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Stace Jaymal Barto
Defendant: Andrew M Saul and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2021cv04016
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Ammann Carrington on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Carrington, Melissa)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Social Security Case Packet) (mmc)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Stace Jaymal Barto. Dismissal Deadline 7/26/2021. (mmc)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 4/14/2021. (mmc)
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 5/6/2021. (des)
April 6, 2021 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (des)
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Stace Jaymal Barto (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (Forker, Wilford) Modified event type and text on 4/6/2021 (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barto v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stace Jaymal Barto
Represented By: Wilford L Forker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Melissa Ammann Carrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?