Mysteryboy Incorporated et al v. Turner et al
Plaintiff: Mysteryboy Incorporated and Eddie C Risdal
Defendant: Cory Turner, Tom Hengeveld and Thomas Hengeveld
Case Number: 5:2021cv04022
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Show Cause. #1 Pro Se Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eddie C Risdal is denied. Risdal will be given 30 days from the date of this order to pay the $402 filing fee. If he does not pay the filing fee, his complaint will be denied without further order of the court. Because it appears that Risdal has attempted to defraud this court, he is hereby ordered to show cause why he should not be sanctioned. If Risdal fails to reply with an explanation within 21 days of the date of this order, or if his reply fails to adequately explain his apparent violation of Rule 11(b), he will be sanctioned pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(c). Within 14 days after Risdal files a reply, defendants may file a response setting forth their position on whether Risdal should be sanctioned, along with any supporting documentation. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 8/10/2021. (copy w/nef mailed to Risdal) (des)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Eddie C Risdal (filed as such pursuant to PSLC) (nef mailed to plaintiff) (des)
August 9, 2021 ***Attorney Gretchen Witte Kraemer for Defendants Thomas Hengeveld and Cory Turner added pursuant to #3 filed on 7/14/2021. No conflicts identified. Attorney admission verified. (des)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 RESISTANCE to Motion re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Thomas Hengeveld, Cory Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Account Statement, #2 Exhibit Account Verification Form, #3 Exhibit Request) (Kraemer, Gretchen)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 Pro se Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: The Clerks office is directed to send this order, along with a copy of the motion and the complaint to the defendants care of the Iowa Attorney Generals Office. The defendants will be given 30 days from the date of this order to file a response. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 6/16/2021. (copy mailed to Pltf; Order, complaint and motion mailed to Iowa Attorney General) (jjh)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Eddie C Risdal. (Attachments: #1 1983 Petitiion) (ksy)(NEF to Plf)(PSLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mysteryboy Incorporated et al v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Turner
Represented By: Gretchen Witte Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Hengeveld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Hengeveld
Represented By: Gretchen Witte Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mysteryboy Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie C Risdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?