Intirion Corporation v. College Products, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Intirion Corporation
Counter Claimant: College Products, Inc
Case Number: 5:2023cv04023
Filed: April 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2023 Filing 103 TEXT ORDER granting #101 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James G. Gorman, III on behalf of Defendant College Products, Inc. Upon review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 11/14/2023. (ksy)
November 13, 2023 Filing 102 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Intirion Corporation (Patton, Thomas) Modified text on 11/14/2023 (ksy).
November 13, 2023 Filing 101 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James G. Gorman III , Blank Rome LLP, ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-4036997) by Defendant College Products, Inc (Gorman, James)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Setting Hearings re #80 MOTION to Dismiss: This motion along with the technology tutorial hearing and the Markman Hearing. Hearings set for 3/19/2024 09:00 AM in Ctrm 1 (2nd Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 11/01/2023. (klh)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying College Products' 98 Oral Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/25/2023. (jag)
October 25, 2023 Filing 98 ORAL MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Defendant per #97 Minutes (jag)
October 25, 2023 Filing 97 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/25/2023. Official Court Record: FTR Gold (jag)
October 23, 2023 Filing 96 NOTICE by Intirion Corporation re #77 Order Setting Hearing, [Joint] (Patton, Thomas)
October 19, 2023 Filing 95 TEXT ORDER granting #94 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Luke P. DE Leon on behalf of Plaintiff Intirion Corporation, Counter Defendant Intirion Corporation. Upon review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 10/19/2023. (ksy)
October 18, 2023 Filing 94 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Luke P. de Leon ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-4019826) by Plaintiff Intirion Corporation, Counter Defendant Intirion Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (Minnesota)) (DE Leon, Luke)
September 22, 2023 Filing 93 REPLY BRIEF to re #80 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Products Inc.'s Second Amended Counterclaims XIII-XVIII filed by Intirion Corporation. (Donels, Cara)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 TEXT ORDER granting #91 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #80 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Products Inc.'s Second Amended Counterclaims XIII-XVIII . The deadline for plaintiff to file a Reply Brief is extended to 9/22/2023. Signed by Judge C.J. Williams on 9/18/2023. (skv)
September 18, 2023 Filing 91 UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance/Reply as to #80 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Products Inc.'s Second Amended Counterclaims XIII-XVIII by Plaintiff Intirion Corporation, Counter Defendant Intirion Corporation (Patton, Thomas)
September 15, 2023 Filing 90 PROTECTIVE Order re #89 MOTION for Protective Order Stipulation for Protective Order Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 09/15/2023. (klh)
September 13, 2023 Filing 89 MOTION for Protective Order Stipulation for Protective Order by Plaintiff Intirion Corporation, Counter Defendant Intirion Corporation (Patton, Thomas)
September 12, 2023 Filing 88 RESISTANCE to Motion re #80 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Products Inc.'s Second Amended Counterclaims XIII-XVIII filed by College Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Comparison of Claim 1_876745 & 746, #2 Exhibit 2 '206 Patent IPR Petition (2023.06.08), #3 Exhibit 3 '374 Patent IPR Petition (2023.06.08), #4 Exhibit 4 '876 Patent IPR Petition (2023.06.08), #5 Exhibit 5 US8742304) (Goosmann, Jeana) Modified text on 9/13/2023 (jlh)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re #82 Joint Motion for Protective Order. The pending motion will be terminated. The parties should submit a new proposed protective order by 9/13/2023. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 9/1/2023. (mmc)
August 28, 2023 Filing 86 TEXT ORDER granting #84 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Schuyler G. Troy on behalf Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Intirion Corporation. Upon review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 8/28/2023. (ksy) Modified signature text on 8/28/2023 (ksy).
August 28, 2023 DOCKET Annotation re #80 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Products Inc.'s Second Amended Counterclaims XIII-XVIII : Bound and tabbed copy received in Clerk's office. (ksy)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 TEXT ORDER granting #83 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #80 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Products Inc.'s Second Amended Counterclaims XIII-XVIII . The deadline for defendant to file a response is extended to 9/12/2023. Signed by Judge C.J. Williams on 8/25/2023. (skv)
August 25, 2023 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Schuyler G.Troy ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3984317) by Plaintiff Intirion Corporation, Counter Defendant Intirion Corporation (Troy, Schuyler)
August 25, 2023 Filing 83 UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance/Reply as to #80 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Products Inc.'s Second Amended Counterclaims XIII-XVIII by Defendant College Products, Inc (Goosmann, Jeana)
August 22, 2023 Filing 82 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Intirion Corporation, Counter Defendant Intirion Corporation (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C) (Patton, Thomas)
August 22, 2023 Filing 81 STIPULATION for Discovery of Hard Copy and Electronically Stored Information by Intirion Corporation (Johnson, R)
August 21, 2023 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Products Inc.'s Second Amended Counterclaims XIII-XVIII by Plaintiff Intirion Corporation, Counter Defendant Intirion Corporation Responses due by 9/5/2023 (Attachments: #1 Brief Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Intirion Corporation's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Products Inc.'s Second Amended Counterclaims XIII-XVIII, #2 Declaration of R. Scott Johnson in Support of Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Intirion Corporation's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Products Inc.'s Second Amended Counterclaims XIII-XVIII, #3 Exhibit A, Deere & Co. and Johns Deere Shared Servs., Inc. v. Kinze Mfg. and Ag Leader Tech., Inc., No. 4:20-cv-00389-RGE-HCA, Dkt. 303, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C) (Patton, Thomas)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. Plaintiff is directed to file their Motion to Dismiss and attach their overlength brief to that motion pursuant to Local Rule 7(b)(1-3). Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 08/21/2023. (klh)
August 21, 2023 Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Products Inc.'s Second Amended Counterclaims XIII-XVIII by Plaintiff Intirion Corporation, Counter Defendant Intirion Corporation (Attachments: #1 Brief Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Intirion Corporation's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Products Inc.'s Second Amended Counterclaims XIII-XVIII) (Patton, Thomas)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Setting Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/25/2023 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. By Monday, 10/23/2023, the parties shall file a notice. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 8/16/2023. (jag)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Amending Deadline re #75 Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan. The court issued a scheduling order that incorrectly set the deadline to serve initial infringement contentions for 8/15/2023. The court hereby amends that order as follows: Serve initial infringement contentions: 09/15/2023. The remaining deadlines and hearing ready dates remain unchanged. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 8/16/2023. (jag)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 08/29/2023 but not filed with the court. File proposed protective order(s) due by 08/22/2023. Add Parties Deadline due by 9/5/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 9/22/2023. Joint claim construction statement due by 11/13/2023. Joint claim construction brief due by 01/19/2024. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 08/15/2023. (klh)
August 15, 2023 Filing 74 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Scheduling Conference held on 8/15/2023. Official Court Record: FTR Gold (klh)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Russell T. Wong on behalf of Defendant College Products, Inc. Upon review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. Check Status Deadline for CM/ECF registration due by 8/24/2023. Signed by Clerk on 8/10/2023. (eAttyWong) (ksy)
August 9, 2023 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Russell T. Wong ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3973117) by Defendant College Products, Inc (Goosmann, Jeana)
August 9, 2023 Filing 71 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 08/15/2023 at 11:30 AM (Telephonic Zoom Hearing: dial-in hearing participation instructions emailed to attorneys on 08/09/2023) before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 08/09/2023. (Gollhofer, Jami)
August 7, 2023 Filing 70 AMENDED ANSWER (Second) With Jury Demand to #62 Amended Complaint, Second, AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Intirion Corporation by College Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P) (Hale, William)
August 1, 2023 Filing 69 NOTICE by Intirion Corporation re #58 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Product Inc.'s Counterclaims IX-XIII Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Intirion Corporation's Notice of Withdrawal of its Previously Filed Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 58 (Johnson, R)
July 26, 2023 Filing 68 ANSWER With Jury Demand to #62 Amended Complaint, , AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Intirion Corporation by College Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Hale, William)
July 26, 2023 Filing 67 RESISTANCE to Motion re #58 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Product Inc.'s Counterclaims IX-XIII filed by College Products, Inc. (Hale, William)
July 10, 2023 Filing 66 TEXT ORDER granting #65 UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #62 Amended Complaint, #58 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Product Inc.'s Counterclaims IX-XIII filed by College Products, Inc. Deadlines extended: Answer deadline extended for College Products, Inc., and now due 07/26/2023, and Response deadline extended for #58 MOTION to Dismiss now due by 07/26/2023. Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 07/10/2023. (Gollhofer, Jami)
July 10, 2023 Filing 65 UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #62 Amended Complaint, #58 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Product Inc.'s Counterclaims IX-XIII by Counter Claimant College Products, Inc, Defendant College Products, Inc (Hale, William)
July 7, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney no longer assigned to the case as presider. Motions referred to Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. (No conflicts identified) (ksy)
July 6, 2023 Filing 64 PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Intirion Corporation, Counter Defendant Intirion Corporation (Patton, Thomas)
June 29, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) forwarded to the Director of the US Patent and Trademark Office re #62 Amended Complaint. (ksy)
June 28, 2023 Filing 62 AMENDED Complaint With Jury Demand against College Products, Inc, filed by Intirion Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, US 9,657,974, #2 Exhibit 2, US 9,791,206, #3 Exhibit 3, US 11,274,876, #4 Exhibit 4, US 10,495,374, #5 Exhibit 5, US 11,674,745, #6 Exhibit 6, US 11,674,746, #7 Exhibit 7) (Patton, Thomas)
June 28, 2023 Filing 61 BRIEF in Support of #58 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Product Inc.'s Counterclaims IX-XIII filed by Intirion Corporation (jag)
June 28, 2023 Filing 60 TEXT ORDER granting #59 Unresisted Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief filed by Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Intirion Corporation. The Clerk of Court will detach and docket the overlength brief [59-1], pursuant to Local Rule 7(h). Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 06/28/2023. (Gollhofer, Jami)
June 28, 2023 Filing 59 UNRESISTED MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Product Inc.'s Counterclaims IX-XIII by Plaintiff Intirion Corporation, Counter Defendant Intirion Corporation (Attachments: #1 Brief Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Intirion Corporation's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Product Inc.'s Counterclaims IX-XIII) (Patton, Thomas)
June 28, 2023 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff College Product Inc.'s Counterclaims IX-XIII by Plaintiff Intirion Corporation, Counter Defendant Intirion Corporation Responses due by 7/12/2023 (Patton, Thomas)
June 7, 2023 Filing 57 College Products, Inc. ANSWER With Jury Demand to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Intirion Corporation by College Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Goosmann, Jeana) Modified text on 6/8/2023 (ksy).
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed in case 5:23-cv-04002-KEM and consolidates these cases for all purposes including trial. The Intirion Corporation case will be the lead case - all future filings will be docketed only in Case No. 23-CV-4023-KEM. College Products may file its answer and counterclaim in Case No. 23-CV-4023. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 6/7/2023. (pac) Modified text on 6/7/2023 (jlh)
May 30, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript of Status Conference Proceedings held on 05/04/2023, before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Court Reporter Shelly Semmler, Telephone number 712-233-3846, Email Address ssemmlerreporting@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter, the Clerk of Court's office, or PACER. Please see Public Administrative Order No. 08-AO-0009-P in regard to relevant policy and access information on the court's website at www.iand.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/20/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/30/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2023. (klh)
May 15, 2023 Filing 54 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Intirion Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Danby Products Inc. for Intirion Corporation. (Johnson, R)
May 15, 2023 Filing 53 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by College Products, Inc identifying Corporate Parent College Products, Inc for College Products, Inc. (Goosmann, Jeana)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Oral Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan: Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan due by 7/5/2023. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 5/5/2023. (pac)
May 5, 2023 Filing 51 ORAL MOTION for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines per #50 Minutes. (klh)
May 5, 2023 Filing 50 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Status Conference held on 5/4/2023. Order to follow. Official Court Record: FTR Gold (klh)
May 3, 2023 Filing 49 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing: Status Conference set for 05/04/2023 at 2:00 PM (Telephonic Hearing - dial-in Zoom instructions emailed to attorneys on 05/03/2023) before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Parties to provide, by email to Judge Mahoney's chambers, the list of hearing issues prior to scheduled hearing (as discussed in email communications). Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 05/03/2023. (Gollhofer, Jami)
April 27, 2023 Filing 48 TEXT ORDER granting #45 and #46 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorneys Domingo M Llagostera and Attorney Megan R Wood: Upon review of the motions and certificates of good standing, the court finds the motions should be granted. Check Status deadline for PHV payment due by 5/4/2023. Signed by Clerk on 4/27/2023. (ksy) Modified on 5/1/2023 to note PHV payments previously paid in 23cv4002 (des)
April 27, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by William Jeremiah Hale on behalf of College Products, Inc. (Hale, William)
April 27, 2023 Set Deadline: AARF payment due from Attorney Goosmann (paid 4/27/2023); PHV payments due re #45 and #46 Motions to Appear PHV. Check Status Deadline due by 5/4/2023. (ksy) Modified text on 4/27/2023 (ksy).
April 26, 2023 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Megan Wood by Defendant College Products, Inc (Goosmann, Jeana)
April 26, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Domingo Llagostera by Defendant College Products, Inc (Goosmann, Jeana)
April 26, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeana L Goosmann on behalf of College Products, Inc. (Goosmann, Jeana)
April 25, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Frey on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Frey, Michael)
April 24, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Cara S Donels on behalf of Intirion Corporation. (Donels, Cara)
April 24, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Patton on behalf of Intirion Corporation. (Patton, Thomas)
April 24, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by R Scott Johnson on behalf of Intirion Corporation. (Johnson, R)
April 14, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) forwarded to the Director of the US Patent and Trademark Office (des)
April 13, 2023 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS: Your case has been opened in the NDIA and assigned a new case number. Please review the attached document and forms for compliance with this Court's Local Rules. Scheduling Report due by 5/15/2023. Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 5/15/2023. Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 5/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions Transferred packet) (eSchrader, eMcSwain, eMacLemore, eOlivarez, eFirmin) (des)
April 13, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE to Attorneys Domingo M Llagostera, Megan R Wood, Andrew Grant Schrader, Andy McSwain, Dan N MacLemore IV, Lauren J Olivarez, Mark E Firmin Not Admitted to Practice in the United States District Court For the Northern District of Iowa. Admissions due by 4/27/2023. (eSchrader, eMcSwain, eMacLemore, eOlivarez, eFirmin) (des) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2023: #1 Email Confirmation) (des).
April 13, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 7/12/2023. (eSchrader, eMcSwain, eMacLemore, eOlivarez, eFirmin) (des)
April 13, 2023 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:22-cv-00459. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 4/13/2023 (des). NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE
April 13, 2023 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)
April 10, 2023 Filing 34 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Sealed Order re #12 . Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ad3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
April 4, 2023 Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #Standing Order Governing Proceedings - Patent Cases available by clicking the hyperlink. (bot2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
March 28, 2023 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Miscellaneous Hearing (MOTIONS HEARING) held on 3/28/2023. PARTIES ANNOUNCE READY. STATEMENTS AND ARGUMENTS OF COUNSEL HEARD. WRITTEN ORDER FORTHCOMING, CASE WILL BE TRANSFERRED. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(zv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Setting Motion Hearing for 3/28/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
March 22, 2023 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by College Products, Inc., re #28 Opposed MOTION to Expedite DEFENDANT'S OPPOSED EXPEDITED MOTION TO STAY THIS PROCEEDING PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE filed by Defendant College Products, Inc. (Llagostera, Domingo) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
March 22, 2023 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Intirion Corporation, re #28 Opposed MOTION to Expedite DEFENDANT'S OPPOSED EXPEDITED MOTION TO STAY THIS PROCEEDING PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE filed by Defendant College Products, Inc. (MacLemore, Dan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
March 15, 2023 Filing 28 Opposed MOTION to Expedite DEFENDANT'S OPPOSED EXPEDITED MOTION TO STAY THIS PROCEEDING PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE by College Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Defendant's Opposed Expedited Motion to Stay this Proceeding pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue)(Llagostera, Domingo) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
March 8, 2023 Filing 27 Redacted Public Version DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR IMPROPER VENUE UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(3) of #23 Sealed Document, by College Products, Inc.. (Llagostera, Domingo) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Before the Court is Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Postpone its Deadline to File a Motion to Transfer Venue. Having considered the Motion, and for good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant College Product, Inc.'s deadline to file a motion to transfer is extended from March 10, 2023, to and including April 11, 2023. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (RJlc) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
March 6, 2023 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue by College Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Postpone its Deadline to File a Motion to Transfer Venue)(Llagostera, Domingo) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
March 6, 2023 Filing 25 Redacted Copy: RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Intirion Corporation, re #22 Sealed Motion Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Intirion Corporation filed by Plaintiff Intirion Corporation [REDACTED] (MacLemore, Dan) Modified on 3/6/2023 to include "Redacted Copy" due to counsel using incorrect event entry (zv). [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
March 6, 2023 Counsel is reminded that all redacted copies filed in a case are to be filed using Other Documents - Redacted Copy. Thank you. (zv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
March 3, 2023 Filing 24 SUPPLEMENT to #23 Sealed Document, Exh 2_Declaration of Megan R. Wood ISO Defendant's reply ISO its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Improper Venue Fed.R.Civ. P. 12(B)(3) by College Products, Inc.. (Llagostera, Domingo) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
March 3, 2023 Filing 23 Sealed Document: DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR IMPROPER VENUE UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(3) of #12 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss , #22 Sealed Motion Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Intirion Corporation by College Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_[SEALED] Decl. Edwin Pedraza, #2 Exhibit 3_[SEALED] Decl. Eric Hennings) (Llagostera, Domingo)[Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
February 24, 2023 Filing 22 Sealed Motion Plaintiff's Response to #12 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Intirion Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6) (MacLemore, Dan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
January 11, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE to the Court by Intirion Corporation (MacLemore, Dan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Megan R. Wood. Attorney added for College Products, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
January 5, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Domingo Manuel Llagostera in support of Megan R. Wood, Blank Rome LLP ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16925514) by on behalf of College Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Pro Hac Vice Motion for Megan R. Wood - Blank Rome LLP)(Llagostera, Domingo) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
December 20, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE Amended Notice of Intention to take the Oral Deposition of College Products Corporate Representative by Intirion Corporation (MacLemore, Dan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Intention to take the Oral Deposition of College Products, Inc.'s Corporate Representative by Intirion Corporation (MacLemore, Dan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
November 7, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE to the Court by Intirion Corporation (MacLemore, Dan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
October 13, 2022 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT by Intirion Corporation. (MacLemore, Dan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
October 11, 2022 Filing 14 ADVISORY TO THE COURT (NOTICE TO THE COURT) re #13 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3) by Intirion Corporation . (MacLemore, Dan) Modified on 10/11/2022 to correct docket text and link to Motion (zv). [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
October 11, 2022 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3) by Intirion Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MacLemore, Dan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
September 27, 2022 Filing 12 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss by College Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_Declaration of Eric Hennings in support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss)(Llagostera, Domingo) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
September 27, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR IMPROPER VENUE UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(3) by College Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue)(Llagostera, Domingo) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
September 16, 2022 Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases,2. #Amended Standing Order On Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases. (bot4) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (WMlc) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
August 10, 2022 Filing 10 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Intirion Corporation. (MacLemore, Dan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
June 27, 2022 Reset Answer Deadlines: College Products, Inc. answer due 8/13/2022. (sv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
June 27, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT COLLEGE PRODUCTS, INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by College Products, Inc.. (Llagostera, Domingo) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intirion Corporation. College Products, Inc. served on 6/8/2022, answer due 6/29/2022. (MacLemore, Dan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Intirion Corporation. (MacLemore, Dan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
May 6, 2022 Filing 7 Corrected Summons Issued as to College Products, Inc. (zv) Counsel for Plaintiff notified clerk's office that previous Summons had an error due to Defendant's name listed (zv). [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
May 6, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to College Productions, Inc.. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
May 6, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Intirion Corporation. (MacLemore, Dan) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/6/2022) (lad). [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
May 6, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intirion Corporation. (MacLemore, Dan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
May 6, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (MacLemore, Dan) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/9/2022) (lad). [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
May 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16004422). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Intirion Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MacLemore, Dan) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/6/2022) (lad). [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.] Modified text on 4/13/2023 to add jury demand (des)
May 6, 2022 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]
May 6, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/13/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intirion Corporation v. College Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Intirion Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Grant Schrader
Represented By: Andy McSwain
Represented By: Dan N MacLemore, IV
Represented By: Lauren J Olivarez
Represented By: Mark E Firmin
Represented By: Cara S Donels
Represented By: Michael J Frey
Represented By: R Scott Johnson
Represented By: Thomas M Patton
Represented By: Schuyler Gerard Troy
Represented By: Luke P DE Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: College Products, Inc
Represented By: Domingo M Llagostera
Represented By: Megan R Wood
Represented By: Jeana L Goosmann
Represented By: William Jeremiah Hale
Represented By: Russell T Wong
Represented By: Russell T. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?