Minnesota Life Insurance Company v. Caradine et al
Plaintiff: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Defendant: J W, Paula Watts, LaDarius Caradine, Jameesha Hawthorne, JaLessa Caradine, Marina Caradine, Andrea Caradine, Jas Watts, Naomi Sisk, Darrell Reasby and Brian Caradine
Case Number: 6:2013cv02068
Filed: September 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Eastern Waterloo Office
County: Black Hawk
Presiding Judge: Edward J McManus
Presiding Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Accepting 50 Report and Recommendations. Clerk shall distribute the funds in accordance with the Beneficiary Designation. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 9/22/2014. (NEF and order mailed to pro se parties; Finance) (pac)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Court direct the Clerk of Court to distribute the remaining life insurance proceeds in a manner consistent with the 6/23/2014, Beneficiary Designation. Objections to R&R due by 9/16/2014. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 9/2/2014. (NEF and R&R mailed to pro se parties) (pac)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 43 MOTION to Set Aside Default Entry re 37 Order Dismissing Without Prejudice Defendants LaDarius Caradine, Marina Caradine, Jameesha Hawthorne, and JaLessa Caradine filed by Andrea Caradine. This matter will come on for Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/20/2014 9:00 AM in 111 7th Avenue SE, Courtroom 3, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 6/30/14. (ksy)(Copy w/NEF to pro se parties)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Deposit Funds, granting Attorney Fees, and granting Dismissal, except not with prejudice. MLIC shall pay over to the Clerk of Court the proceeds of the life insurance policy, $65,059.64, less previously paid funeral expenses and attorney fees and costs, for a net of $48,811.29, plus interest, and thereafter is dismissed. This matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a Report and Recommendation on the question whether the June 23, 2013, Beneficiary Designation was valid. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 6/27/2014. (NEF and order mailed to pro se parties) (pac)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minnesota Life Insurance Company v. Caradine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J W
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaDarius Caradine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jameesha Hawthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JaLessa Caradine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marina Caradine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Caradine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jas Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi Sisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Reasby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Caradine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Molly R Hamilton Cawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?