White v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Larry C White
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2018cv02005
Filed: January 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Eastern Waterloo Office
County: Bremer
Presiding Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is hereby awarded attorney fees in the amount of $5,183.28 to be paid by the Social Security Administration directly to plaintiff. Additionally, plaintiff is hereby awarded $400.00 for the reimbursement of the filing fee to be paid from the Judgment Fund. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 8/13/2019. (skm)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Accepting 19 Report and Recommendations re 1 Complaint filed by Larry C White, recommending that the District Court accept in part and remand in part the case to the ALJ for further proceedings (see text). Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 3/18/2019. (src)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Larry C White, recommending that the District Court accept in part and remand in part the case to the ALJ for further proceedings (see text). Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 2/12/2019. (skm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry C White
Represented By: Thomas A Krause
Represented By: Benjamin R Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?