Goodson v. Napha Care et al
Plaintiff: Mario Goodson
Defendant: Judges of the First Judicial District Court of Black Hawk County, Napha Care, Black Hawk County Sheriff's Department and Joel Dalrymple
Case Number: 6:2018cv02058
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Mark A Roberts
2 Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 Pro Se Correspondence by Mario Goodson. (NEF w/ Response and Docket Sheet mailed to Pro Se Filer) (mmc)
October 3, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge CJ Williams: Judge Linda R Reade no longer assigned to the case: No conflicts identified (kfs)
September 17, 2018 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Magistrate Judge CJ Williams-M no longer assigned to case. No conflicts identified. (src)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00277. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE Modified on 8/22/2018 to note that NEF has been mailed to pro se plaintiff. PSLC notified. (src)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Iowa. See order for particulars. Signed by Senior Judge James E. Gritzner on 8/20/2018. (nlh) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 8/22/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mario Goodson. (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 8/22/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Black Hawk County Sheriff's Department, Joel Dalrymple, Judges of the First Judicial District Court of Black Hawk County, Napha Care, filed by Mario Goodson. (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 8/22/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodson v. Napha Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judges of the First Judicial District Court of Black Hawk County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napha Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Hawk County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Dalrymple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Goodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?