Lee v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Vanessa Lee
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 6:2018cv02063
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File; denying #12 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Court will consider Plaintiff's Resistance to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Failure to State a Claim (Doc. 13) in ruling on defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition at Law (Doc. 9). Defendant's reply, if any, is due by October 26, 2018. The Court will not extend the time for plaintiff to file any motion to remand based on grounds other lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 10/19/18. (ksy)
October 17, 2018 Filing 13 RESISTANCE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Vanessa Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Woods, Larry)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Vanessa Lee Responses due by 10/26/2018 (Woods, Larry)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Time to file resistance by Plaintiff Vanessa Lee (Woods, Larry)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company: Plaintiff has until September 28, 2018, to file a motion to extend the time for plaintiff to resist defendant's motion. Should plaintiff choose to file a motion to extend time, plaintiff is directed to include plaintiff's resistance to defendant's motion to dismiss as an attachment. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 9/25/2018. (skm)
September 21, 2018 Judge CJ Williams added (conflicts list reviewed; none found). Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned as presider to case. (pac)
September 18, 2018 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Magistrate Judge CJ Williams no longer assigned to the case: No conflicts identified (kfs)
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Rademaekers, Iwana)
September 5, 2018 FEE Receipt: $75.00, receipt number IAN550002071 for Pro hac vice fee for Iwana Rademaekers by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (src)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Iwana Rademaekers on behalf of Defendant The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Fee due by 9/7/2018). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 9/4/18. (ksy)
September 4, 2018 Set Fee Date Deadline: PHV Fee for Attorney Rademakers due by 9/7/2018. (ksy)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Iwana Rademaekers by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Rademaekers, Iwana)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 DOCKET Annotation - Please find the new removal case packet attached. (src)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 9/29/2018. (src)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED STATE Court Petition by Vanessa Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (src)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition by Vanessa Lee. (src)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Wallrichs, Brenda)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Fayette County District Court, case number CVCV055206. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2764442), filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 10/29/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81a Statement) (Wallrichs, Brenda) Modified on 8/30/2018 to note that this case was incorrectly opened up in 18cv1034 - this case has been deleted. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Lee
Represented By: Larry F Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brenda K Wallrichs
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Brenda K Wallrichs
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?