In Re: Bill Vorhes, Debtor
Defendant: Bill Vorhes, Debtor
Interested Party: US Trustee and US Bankruptcy Clerk-IAND
Trustee: David A Sergeant
Appellant: Bill A Vorhes
Appellee: Vorhes Ltd
Case Number: 6:2018cv02064
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
2 Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 12 PRO SE MOTION to Stay in all Bankruptcy Proceedings by Appellant Bill A Vorhes. (NEF mailed to filer) (jjh)
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 PRO SE SUPPLEMENT to #10 Appellant's Brief by Bill A Vorhes. (NEF mailed to filer) (jjh)
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 APPELLANT's Brief re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal by Bill A Vorhes. NEF mailed to filer. (src)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Vorhes Ltd (Vickers, Patrick) Modified on 10/3/2018 to note that the appellant has been mailed this document via US Mail. (src)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Petition for Review in Bankruptcy: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure Rule 8010(b)(3), you are hereby notified that on 8/30/2018, the Clerk of Bankruptcy Court filed a Certificate of Transmittal of Appellant Election to Proceed before the US District Court with Clerk of Court in the above action. Appellant's Brief due by 10/27/2018. Appellee's Brief due by 11/26/2018. Appellant's Reply Brief due by 12/10/2018. Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2018. (NEF and notice mailed to Appellant) (pac)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Bankruptcy Appeal by Bill A Vorhes. (NEF mailed to appellant) (pac)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Designated documents from Bankruptcy Court - Part 1, #2 Designated documents from Bankruptcy Court - Part 2, #3 Designated documents from Bankruptcy Court - Part 3, #4 Designated documents from Bankruptcy Court - Part 4, #5 Designated documents from Bankruptcy Court - Part 5, #6 8/14/2018 Telephonic Scheduling Conference Transcript, #7 9/4/2018 Hearing on Interlocutory Appeal and Motion for Leave to Appeal) (NEF mailed to appellant) (pac)
September 17, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Magistrate Judge CJ Williams-M no longer assigned to case. No conflicts identified. (src)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David A Sergeant re #4 Notice of Appearance (Knight, Jared)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared F Knight on behalf of David A Sergeant. (Knight, Jared)
September 6, 2018 Set Deadline: Appellee, Vohres Ltd.'s LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 10/3/2018. (src)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick G Vickers on behalf of Vorhes Ltd. (Vickers, Patrick)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric W Lam on behalf of David A Sergeant. (Lam, Eric)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-1577. File received filed by Bill A Vorhes. (NEF mailed to appellant) (pac) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2018: #1 Motion for Stay, #2 Proceeding Memo and Order) (pac). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: #3 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (pac).
August 30, 2018 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams added (conflicts list reviewed; none found). (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Bill Vorhes, Debtor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Vorhes, Debtor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Bankruptcy Clerk-IAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: David A Sergeant
Represented By: Eric W Lam
Represented By: Jared F Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bill A Vorhes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Vorhes Ltd
Represented By: Patrick G Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?