Ensz v. Chase Bank USA NA
Plaintiff: Starlyn Ensz
Defendant: Chase Bank USA NA
Case Number: 6:2018cv02065
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Carlos Alsina on behalf of Plaintiff. CM/ECF Registration due by 10/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 09/26/2018. (conflicts checked, none found). (jjh) Modified on 10/15/2018, copy w/NEF and CMECF registration eAlsina (skm).
September 18, 2018 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Magistrate Judge CJ Williams no longer assigned to the case: No conflicts identified (kfs)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Carlos Alsina ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2776466) by Plaintiff Starlyn Ensz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Good Standing) (Ravnsborg, Jason)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Chase Bank USA NA. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (jjh)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 9/30/2018. (jjh)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT JURY DEMAND against Chase Bank USA NA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2764476.), filed by Starlyn Ensz. Scheduling Report due by 11/28/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ravnsborg, Jason) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/31/2018 to add case co) (jjh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ensz v. Chase Bank USA NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starlyn Ensz
Represented By: Jason R Ravnsborg
Represented By: Carlos C Alsina-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?