O'Connell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Angelia Kay O'Connell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2018cv02072
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Upon consent of the parties Commissioner of Social Security and Angelia Kay O'Connell, this case is reassigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney for final disposition. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 10/15/2018. (src)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Schunk on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Schunk, Jacob)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Allen Moss on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Moss, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Social Security new case packet) (des)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Angelia Kay O'Connell. Dismissal Deadline 12/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (des)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 9/11/2018. (des)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check status by 10/10/2018. (skm)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Angelia Kay O'Connell (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Basque, Joseph) (Main Document 1 and 2 replaced on 9/10/2018 to add corrected case number, case originally opened in incorrect division) (skm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Connell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michael Allen Moss
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelia Kay O'Connell
Represented By: Joseph George Basque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?