Porter v. ABM Industry Groups, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Aprylle Porter
Defendant: ABM Industry Groups, LLC, Cheryl Michels and Jessica Fulcher
Case Number: 6:2018cv02073
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - Granting #14 Joint MOTION to Stay Due to Pending Mediation filed by Jessica Fulcher, Cheryl Michels and ABM Industry Groups, LLC. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 12/14/2018. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/16/2018. (src)
November 15, 2018 Filing 17 ***TEXT ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference HEaring. A telephonic status conference hearing shall be held on 11/29/2018 at 9:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call the court's conference line at 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 to be joined with the call. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/15/2018. (Gollhofer, Jami) Modified on 11/16/2018 (ksy).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Helen C Adams at the United States Courthouse, Des Moines, IA in Room 420, with representatives for Plaintiff and corporate representatives appearing by video conference, coordinated by counsel. See Order text for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Helen C Adams on 11/15/2018. (mmc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher E Hoyme on behalf of All Defendants. (Hoyme, Christopher)
November 9, 2018 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Stay Due to Pending Mediation by Defendant ABM Industry Groups, LLC. (Cano, Catherine) Modified on 11/13/2018 to edit text. (src)
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 DISREGARD FILED IN ERROR - Joint Motion to Stay Due to Pending Mediation by Defendants ABM Industry Groups, LLC, Jessica Fulcher, Cheryl Michels (Cano, Catherine) Modified on 11/13/2018 (ksy).
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendants' Answer deadline extended to 11/09/18. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 10/24/18. (kfs)
October 23, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant ABM Industry Groups LLC (Hoyme, Christopher) Modified text on 10/23/2018 (kfs)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** granting #8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; for the reasons stated in the motion (Doc. 8), the answer deadline is extended for all Defendants to October 26, 2018. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/12/2018. (Gollhofer, Jami)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Defendant ABM Industry Groups, LLC's Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABM Industry Groups, LLC (Hoyme, Christopher)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 Joint motion to extend answer/responsive pleading deadline by ABM Industry Groups, LLC. (Hoyme, Christopher) Modified on 10/10/2018 to correct event type. (src)
October 4, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge CJ Williams: Chief Judge Leonard T Strand no longer assigned to the case: No conflicts identified (kfs)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendants' Answer ddl 10/12/18. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 10/01/18. (kfs)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Stipulation by Defendant ABM Industry Groups, LLC (Hoyme, Christopher)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brock J Pohlmeier on behalf of Defendant AMB Industry Groups, LLC, on the condition attorney submits CM/ECF Registration Form by 10/15/2018. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 9/28/2018. (eAtty Pohlmeier) (des) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2018: #1 Receipt Confirmation) (des).
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brock J. Pohlmeier. ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2783864) by Defendant ABM Industry Groups, LLC (Hoyme, Christopher) Modified on text 9/28/2018 (ksy).
September 24, 2018 Set Deadline: Defendant ABM Industry Groups, LLC LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 10/12/2018. (skm)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: Please find attached the new civil removal case packet. (skm)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Aprylle Porter. (skm)
September 24, 2018 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from In the Iowa District Court in and for Blackhawk County, case number LACV135545. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2779804), filed by ABM Industry Groups, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 11/20/2018 (Hoyme, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (skm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. ABM Industry Groups, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Industry Groups, LLC
Represented By: Christopher E Hoyme
Represented By: Brock Joseph Pohlmeier
Represented By: Catherine Anne Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Michels
Represented By: Christopher E Hoyme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Fulcher
Represented By: Christopher E Hoyme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aprylle Porter
Represented By: Katie Ervin Carlson
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth McCarty
Represented By: Katie Anne Ervin Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?