Banwart et al v. Cedar Falls Community School District et al

Plaintiff: Christy Banwart and Lance Banwart
Defendant: Cedar Falls Community School District and Area Education Agency 267
Case Number: 6:2018cv02074
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 Proof of Service by Christy Banwart. Cedar Falls Community School District served on 10/3/2018. (Schwartz, Brandon) Modified text on 11/1/2018 (mmc).
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 Proof of Service by Christy Banwart. Area Education Agency 267 served on 10/3/2018. (Schwartz, Brandon) Modified text on 11/1/2018 (mmc).
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Area Education Agency 267, Cedar Falls Community School District.(Zeschke, Dustin) Modified on 10/24/2018 to edit text. (src)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin Troy Zeschke on behalf of All Defendants. (Zeschke, Dustin)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Area Education Agency 267, Cedar Falls Community School District. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 11/1/2018. (des)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2785348.), filed by Christy Banwart, Lance Banwart. Scheduling Report due by 12/31/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Complaint, #5 Exhibit D to Complaint) (Schwartz, Brandon) Modified text on 10/2/2018 to remove duplicate text from names of Attachments. Main Document 1, Attachment 2, Attachment 3, Attachment 4 and Attachment 5 replaced on 10/2/2018 pursuant to MAR chambers and LR 10(g) (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banwart et al v. Cedar Falls Community School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Banwart
Represented By: Brandon M Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Banwart
Represented By: Brandon M Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Falls Community School District
Represented By: Dustin Troy Zeschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Area Education Agency 267
Represented By: Dustin Troy Zeschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?