Westport Insurance Corporation v. Fireye, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Westport Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Fireye, Inc., Magnatrol Valve Corp, Simes Systems, LLC, Fireye, Inc and Unknown Manufacturers 1-3
Case Number: 6:2018cv02077
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures ddl 11/28/18 but not filed with the court: Add Parties ddl 01/14/2019: Amended Pleadings ddl 01/14/2019: Plaintiff's Expert Witness ddl 02/12/2019: Defendants' Expert Witness ddl 04/15/2019: Plaintiff's Rebuttal Experts ddl 05/13/2019: Discovery ddl 07/12/2019: Motions ddl 08/12/2019: Trial Ready ddl 01/09/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/30/18. (kfs)
November 30, 2018 Filing 24 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference held on 11/30/2018: Order to follow (Court Reporter: FTR Gold) (kfs)
November 28, 2018 Filing 23 (FILED IN ERROR) Initial Disclosure Statement Rule 26(a)(1) by Fireye, Inc (Rhoades, Travis) Modified on 11/29/2018, discovery not to be filed (skm).
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Status Conference set for 11/30/2018 at 9:30 AM in Ctrm 1 (1st Floor) Sioux City before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/26/18. (Attachment #1 Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan) (kfs)
November 26, 2018 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney no longer assigned to the case as the case presider: No conflicts identified (kfs)
November 8, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint by Magnatrol Valve Corp.(Bardole, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 20 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Westport Insurance Corporation (Bierstedt, Clarissa)
October 26, 2018 Filing 19 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Magnatrol Valve Corp (Bardole, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 18 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Fireye, Inc (Weston, J)
October 18, 2018 Filing 17 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michelle R. Rodemyer is withdrawn and representation by Ms. Rodemyer of Defendant Simes Systems, LLC is terminated. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/18/2018. (Gollhofer, Jami)
October 18, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Simes Systems, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rodemyer, Michelle)
October 15, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John Vincent McCoy on behalf of Simes Systems, LLC. (McCoy, John)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Travis J. Rhoades on behalf of Defendant Fireye, Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 10/15/2018. (mmc)
October 12, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Simes Systems, LLC.(Rodemyer, Michelle) Modified text on 10/12/2018 (mmc). Modified text on 10/15/2018 (skm).
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Simes Systems, LLC (Rodemyer, Michelle)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 (DOCKETED IN ERROR) - Defendant Simes, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by Simes Systems, LLC.(Rodemyer, Michelle) Modified on 10/12/2018 to note that the correct document is filed at docket no. #13 . (src)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT to Removal RE: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Simes Systems LLC (Rodemyer, Michelle) Modified text on 10/12/2018 (kfs)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle R Rodemyer on behalf of Simes Systems, LLC. (Rodemyer, Michelle)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand Complaint by Fireye, Inc.(Weston, J)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Travis J. Rhoades ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2790941) by Defendant Fireye, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Weston, J)
October 5, 2018 Set Deadlines: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 11/30/2018. Defendants' LR 7.1 Disclosure Statements due by 10/25/2018 (NEF eBardole). (skm)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: Please find attached the new civil removal case packet (copy w/NEF eBardole). (skm)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE to Attorney(s) Not Admitted re #1 Notice of Removal (copy w/NEF eBardole). (skm)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Westport Insurance Corporation (copy w/NEF eBardole). (skm)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status by 11/4/2018 (copy w/NEF eBardole). (skm)
October 5, 2018 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 CONSENT to Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, by Magnatrol Valve Corp (Bryan, James) Modified text on 10/5/2018 (skm).
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Floyd County, case number LAC031232. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2788131), filed by Fireye, Inc. Scheduling Report due by 12/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 LR 81.a Statement) (Weston, J) (Main Document 1 and Attachments 2 and 4 replaced on 10/5/2018 to add case number to documents) (skm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westport Insurance Corporation v. Fireye, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireye, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin M Weston
Represented By: J Michael Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnatrol Valve Corp
Represented By: John Scott Bardole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simes Systems, LLC
Represented By: John Vincent McCoy
Represented By: Michelle R Rodemyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireye, Inc
Represented By: Benjamin M Weston
Represented By: J Michael Weston
Represented By: Travis James Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Manufacturers 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westport Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Clarissa A Bierstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?