Wells et al v. LF Noll, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Steve Wells and Teresa Wells
Defendant: LF Noll, Inc and Deck Law, PLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv02079
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement of Defendants by Deck Law, PLC, LF Noll, Inc (Parry, Patrick)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 1/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/30/2019 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Judge CJ Williams. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/27/2019. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 12/19/2018. (jjh)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 1/4/2019 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 2/4/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 3/15/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 5/14/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 6/13/2019. Discovery due by 7/15/2019. Motions due by 8/13/2019. Trial Ready Deadline 1/13/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 12/18/2018. (mmc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference held on 12/18/2018. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (mmc)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 10:00 AM (Telephonic Hearing) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. See Order for telephonic hearing dial-in participation instructions. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 proposed scheduling order). (Gollhofer, Jami) Modified text on 12/17/2018 (pac).
November 20, 2018 Set Deadline: Defendants' LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/19/2018. (pac)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Thomas Parry on behalf of Deck Law, PLC, LF Noll, Inc. (Parry, Patrick)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Deck Law, PLC, LF Noll, Inc.(Parry, Patrick)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Steve Wells (Baresel, William)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Steve Wells. LF Noll, Inc served. (Baresel, William) Modified text on 11/1/2018 (pac).
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Steve Wells. Deck Law, PLC served. (Baresel, William) Modified text on 11/1/2018 (pac).
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Deck Law, PLC, LF Noll, Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Teresa Wells, filed by Steve Wells. Scheduling Report due by 1/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (Baresel, William) Modified names of attachments on 10/25/2018 (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells et al v. LF Noll, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Wells
Represented By: William P Baresel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Wells
Represented By: William P Baresel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LF Noll, Inc
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deck Law, PLC
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?