Jones v. Wachtendorf et al

Petitioner: Jessie James Jones, Jr
Respondent: Patti Wachtendorf and Iowa, State of
Case Number: 6:2018cv02087
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
0 Judge: Kelly Mahoney
1 Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Clerk checked for conflicts as to parties and attorney - none found. (des)
November 9, 2018 6 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00242. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE Modified on 11/9/2018 to note PSLC notified and copy of docket sheet to pro se petitioner (des)
November 9, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. Case electronically transferred to IAND. (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 11/9/2018.]
November 8, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Iowa. The Clerk of Court shall process the transfer. Signed by Senior Judge James E. Gritzner on 11/8/2018. (nlh) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 11/9/2018.]
July 27, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron James Rogers on behalf of Patti Wachtendorf (Rogers, Aaron) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 11/9/2018.]
July 26, 2018 3 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jessie James Jones, Jr. (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 11/9/2018.]
July 26, 2018 2 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jessie James Jones, Jr. (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 11/9/2018.]
July 26, 2018 1 PRO SE PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jessie James Jones, Jr. (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 11/9/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Wachtendorf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessie James Jones, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patti Wachtendorf
Represented By: Aaron James Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Iowa, State of
Represented By: Aaron James Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?