Barrett v. Schwab
Plaintiff: Laura Barrett
Defendant: Mike Schwab
Case Number: 6:2018cv02090
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; answer deadline extended for Defendant Mike Schwab to 3/7/2019. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 02/07/2019. (Gollhofer, Jami)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant Mike Schwab (Weber, Molly) Modified text on 02/06/2019 (kfs)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Barrett. All Defendants. (Boles, Matthew)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Affidavit of Service under seal. The Clerk of Court shall seal Doc. 4 (return of summons) due to inclusion of address; on or before February 1, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a redacted version of Doc. 4 (eliminating address) for access to public viewing. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 01/25/2019. (Gollhofer, Jami)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Clifford Witosky on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Witosky, Adam)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Affidavit of Service Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Laura Barrett (Boles, Matthew) Modified text on 01/25/2019 (kfs)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mike Schwab. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 1/9/2019. (des)
December 10, 2018 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Clerk checked for conflicts as to parties and attorney - none found. (des)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT And Jury Demand against Mike Schwab ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2828724) filed by Laura Barrett. Scheduling Report due by 3/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Boles, Matthew) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett v. Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Barrett
Represented By: Matthew Mark Boles
Represented By: Adam Clifford Witosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Schwab
Represented By: Molly McConville Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?