Barker v. Community Bank of Oelwein et al

Plaintiff: Verlin Barker
Defendant: Community Bank of Oelwein and Paul Gray
Case Number: 6:2019cv02003
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 4 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2020 at 09:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 02/25/2019. (jjh)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 2/28/2019 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline by 3/15/2019., Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2019. Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses due by 4/12/2019. Defendant's Expert Witnesses due by 6/14/2019. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Experts due by 7/12/2019. Discovery due by 12/2/2019. Motions due by 1/2/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 6/1/2020. ORDER: Upon consent of the parties Verlin Barker, Community Bank of Oelwein and Paul Gray this case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Roberts for final disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts and Judge CJ Williams on 2/21/2019. (skm)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Scheduling Conference held on 2/21/2019. (Court Reporter FTR Gold) (jjh)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2019 at 09:30 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 02/14/2019. (jjh)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Community Bank of Oelwein (Hanson, Margaret)
January 8, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 2/8/2019. (ksy)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation: New Civil Removal Case Packet attached. (ksy)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 State Court Petition by Defendants Community Bank of Oelwein, Paul Gray.(ksy)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Verlin Barker (ksy)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 2/8/2019. (ksy)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts reviewed as to parties and attorneys, none found. (ksy)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Fayette County, case number LACV055325. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2843925), filed by Community Bank of Oelwein, Paul Gray. Scheduling Report due by 3/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Hanson, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. Community Bank of Oelwein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verlin Barker
Represented By: Mark D Sherinian
Represented By: Melissa Carol Hasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Bank of Oelwein
Represented By: Margaret Ann Hanson
Represented By: Deborah M Tharnish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Gray
Represented By: Margaret Ann Hanson
Represented By: Deborah M Tharnish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?