Iverson v. DECO Products Company, LLLP

Plaintiff: Steven Iverson
Defendant: Deco Products Company, LLLP
Case Number: 6:2019cv02008
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
0 Judge: Kelly Mahoney
1 Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 4/24/2019 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 6/10/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 6/10/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 7/10/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 9/10/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 10/10/2019. Discovery due by 12/10/2019. Motions due by 1/10/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 6/8/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 4/11/2019. (des)
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference held on 4/4/2019. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (mmc)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2019 at 11:00 AM (Telephonic Hearing - see text of Order for dial-in participation instructions) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 03/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 proposed scheduling order) (Gollhofer, Jami)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Upon consent of the parties DECO Products Company, LLLP and Steven Iverson, this case is reassigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney for final disposition. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 03/29/2019. (jjh)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint by Deco Products Company, LLLP.(McDonald, Elliott)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Steven Iverson. (src)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 STATE Court Petition by Steven Iverson. (src)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Deco Products Company, LLLP (McDonald, Elliott)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet by Deco Products Company, LLLP (McDonald, Elliott) Modified text on 2/20/2019 (skm).
February 19, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 3/21/2019. (src)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET Annotation - Please find the new removal case packet attached. (src)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Winneshiek County, case number LACV026434. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2875663), filed by DECO PRODUCTS COMPANY LLLP. Scheduling Report due by 4/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Original Notice, #3 Jury Demand, #4 Return of Service, #5 Notice of Filing) (McDonald, Elliott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iverson v. DECO Products Company, LLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deco Products Company, LLLP
Represented By: Elliott R McDonald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Iverson
Represented By: Kevin E Schoeberl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?