United States Department of Labor v. Dajerabby, Inc et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Department of Labor and United States Department of Labor
Defendant: Ivan Weiland, Dajerabby, Inc. and Dajerabby, Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv02013
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT in accordance with the attached. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 03/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Judgment) (ksy)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT JUDGMENT granting #7 Renewed MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by United States Department of Labor. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 3/27/2019. (ksy)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 Renewed MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Plaintiff United States Department of Labor (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Judgment, #2 Exhibit A) (Hague, Dana)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Carroll on behalf of Dajerabby, Inc, Ivan Weiland. (Carroll, Michael)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Department of Labor. All Defendants. (Hague, Dana)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 03/08/2019. (jjh) Modified text on 3/8/2019 (jjh).
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dajerabby, Inc, Ivan Weiland. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (skm)
March 5, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm) Modified on 3/5/2019, attorney admission verified for Dana Hague (skm).
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Plaintiff U.S. Department of Labor (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Judgment, #2 Exhibit A to Proposed Consent Judgment) (Hague, Dana) Modified text on 3/5/2019 (skm).
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by U.S. Department of Labor. Scheduling Report due by 6/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hague, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Department of Labor v. Dajerabby, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Department of Labor
Represented By: Dana Marie Hague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Dana Marie Hague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Weiland
Represented By: Michael J Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dajerabby, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dajerabby, Inc
Represented By: Michael J Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?