Thomas v. Exide Technologies, Inc

Plaintiff: Marico C Thomas
Defendant: Exide Technologies, Inc. and Exide Technologies, Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv02014
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Exide Technologies, Inc. (Olson, Ethan)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Motions at #7 and #8 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys John F Wymer, III and Jason R Carruthers on behalf of Defendant, Exide Technologies, Inc. Upon a review of the Motions and the Certificates of Good Standing, the court finds the Motions should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 3/14/2019. (src)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason R. Carruthers ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2894582) by Defendant Exide Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Carruthers, Jason)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John F. Wymer, III ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2894571) by Defendant Exide Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Wymer, John)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Exide Technologies, Inc..(Olson, Ethan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan S Olson on behalf of Exide Technologies, Inc.. (Olson, Ethan)
March 5, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 3/25/2019. (pac)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET Annotation: Attached is the case packet used in removal cases. (pac)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Marico C Thomas. (pac)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 4/4/2019. (pac)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court of in and for Delaware County, case number LACV008546. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2887513), filed by Exide Technologies, Inc. Scheduling Report due by 5/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Local Rule 81a Statement) (Harty, Frank) Modified text on 3/5/2019 (pac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Exide Technologies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exide Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exide Technologies, Inc
Represented By: Frank Harty
Represented By: John F Wymer, III
Represented By: Jason R Carruthers
Represented By: Ethan S Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marico C Thomas
Represented By: Emilie J Roth Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?