Prudential Insurance Company of America, The v. Williams et al

Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Defendant: Frederick Williams, Peggy J Owens and Frederick Burnside
Case Number: 6:2019cv02015
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Frederick Williams served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Lowe, Aimee) Modified text on 3/28/2019 (des)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Lowe, Aimee)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Peggy J Owens served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Lowe, Aimee) Modified text on 3/28/2019 (des)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Frederick Burnside served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Lowe, Aimee) Modified text on 3/28/2019 (des)
March 6, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 3/26/2019. (pac)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Frederick Burnside, Peggy J Owens, Frederick Williams. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
March 6, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT The Purdential Insurance Company of America against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2889184.), filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Scheduling Report due by 6/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Copy of Plans, #2 Exhibit B-Screenshot of Beneficiary designation, #3 Exhibit C-Insureds Certificate of Death, #4 Exhibit D-Statement of Insurance Coverage, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lowe, Aimee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy J Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Aimee Lind Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Represented By: Aimee Lind Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?