Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Barnett et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: CDB. LLC, Chad Barnett and CDB, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv02019
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Mailing Report on the Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright to the US Copyright Office. (pac)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Dismissing Case. Signed by Clerk on 7/11/2019. (pac)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Dismissal Pursuant to Local Rule 41(a)(2): Unless appropriate action is taken by 7/10/2019, this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 41) (pac)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Chad Barnett served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Hartung, Katherine)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. CDB, LLC served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. (Hartung, Katherine)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Hartung, Katherine)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Mailing Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright to the US Copyright Office. (pac)
March 28, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/17/2019. (pac)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Chad Barnett and CDB, LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
March 28, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2905632), filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Scheduling Report Deadline 6/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hartung, Katherine) Modified text on 3/28/2019 (pac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Barnett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Katherine Joy Hartung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDB. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDB, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?