Bierman et al v. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: rose Bierman and Nicholas Bierman
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Ethicon, Inc and Johnson & Johnson, Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv02025
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Inc (Penner, Nancy)
May 31, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade added (no conflicts identified). Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned as presider to case. (pac)
May 31, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendants' LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 6/30/2019. (pac)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #1 Complaint by Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Penner, Nancy) Modified text on 5/31/2019 (pac).
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #1 Complaint by Ethicon, Inc.(Penner, Nancy) Modified text on 5/31/2019 (pac).
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Nicholas Bierman, Rose Bierman (Dunken, Bert)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bert Tarrant Dunken, Jr. (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number 0862-2933785). Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorney Bert T Dunken, Jr is authorized to appear on behalf of Plaintiffs Rose Bierman and Nicholas Bierman. Signed by Clerk on 5/6/2019. (No conflicts identified) (pac)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bert Tarrant Dunken, Jr. ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2933785) by Plaintiffs Nicholas Bierman, Rose Bierman (Attachments: #1 Declaration Texas Certificate of Good Standing) (Dunken, Bert)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc and Johnson & Johnson, Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 5/30/2019. (pac)
April 30, 2019 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2929379.), filed by rose Bierman, Nicholas Bierman. Scheduling Report due by 7/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lehman, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bierman et al v. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: rose Bierman
Represented By: Bert Tarrant Dunken, Jr
Represented By: Jason D Lehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Bierman
Represented By: Bert Tarrant Dunken, Jr
Represented By: Jason D Lehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc
Represented By: Nancy J Penner
Represented By: Robert D Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc
Represented By: Nancy J Penner
Represented By: Robert D Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?