Richmond v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Jay C Richmond
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 6:2019cv02026
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America (Sarp, Paulette)
June 11, 2019 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Garth D Richmond on behalf of Plaintiff Jay C Richmond. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted, on the condition attorney submits CM/ECF Registration Form by 6/25/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/11/2019. (nef to Atty Richmond) (des)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Garth D. Richmond ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2956480) by Plaintiff Jay C Richmond (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing) (West, Julian)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney M Annie Santos on behalf of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2019. (des)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney M. Annie Santos ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2955905) by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America (Sarp, Paulette)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Sarp, Paulette)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paulette S Sarp on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Sarp, Paulette)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 ERISA Actions new case packet) (des)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 5/31/2019. (des)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2930216) filed by Jay C Richmond. Dismissal Deadline 7/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (West, Julian) Modified name of attachment on 4/30/2019 (des) Modified deadline text on 5/1/2019 (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richmond v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Margaret Ann Santos
Represented By: Paulette S Sarp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay C Richmond
Represented By: Julian Benjamin West
Represented By: Garth D Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?