Pfalzgraf v. Walmart, Inc

Plaintiff: Judith A Pfalzgraf
Defendant: Walmart, Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv02032
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 8/24/2020 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 4 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2020 at 9:00 AM in Hearing before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 6/14/2019. (pac)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 7/12/2019 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 8/9/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/9/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witnesses due by 9/13/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 11/15/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 12/13/2019. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Motions due by 3/13/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 8/10/2020. ORDER: Upon consent of the parties Judith A Pfalzgraf and Walmart, Inc, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts for final disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 6/13/2019 and Judge Linda R Reade on 6/14/2019. (skm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Scheduling Conference held on 6/13/2019. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (pac)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) & 26(f) Scheduling Conference. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2019 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts.See order text for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 6/7/2019. (src)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc (Weston, Benjamin)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Walmart, Inc.(Weston, Benjamin)
May 21, 2019 Set Deadlines: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 6/11/2019. (KMS)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation : Please find civil removal actions new case packet attached. (KMS)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Judith A Pfalzgraf. (KMS)
May 21, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Clerk checked for conflicts as to parties and attorneys-none found. (KMS)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Black Hawk County District Court, case number LACV137288. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2942923), filed by Walmart Inc d/b/a Cedar Falls Supercenter No. 753. Scheduling Report due by 7/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement) (Weston, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfalzgraf v. Walmart, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith A Pfalzgraf
Represented By: Paul W Demro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc
Represented By: Benjamin M Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?