Kim v. University of Northern Iowa et al
Plaintiff: Donghyuk Kim
Defendant: Paula Knudsen, Leslie Williams, Leah Gutknecht, Nicholas Rafanello, University of Northern Iowa, Mark Nook, Allyson Rafanello, Christina Roybal and Leslie K Williams
Case Number: 6:2019cv02037
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donghyuk Kim. Leslie K Williams waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Frerichs, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donghyuk Kim. University of Northern Iowa waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Frerichs, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donghyuk Kim. Nicholas Rafanello waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Frerichs, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donghyuk Kim. Mark Nook waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Frerichs, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donghyuk Kim. Paula Knudsen waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Frerichs, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donghyuk Kim. Leah Gutknecht waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Frerichs, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donghyuk Kim. Christina Roybal waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Frerichs, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donghyuk Kim. Allyson Rafanello waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Frerichs, Thomas)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (skm)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status by 7/18/2019. (skm)
June 18, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2962556.), filed by Donghyuk Kim. Scheduling Report due by 9/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Frerichs, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v. University of Northern Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Knudsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Gutknecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Rafanello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Northern Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Nook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allyson Rafanello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Roybal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie K Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donghyuk Kim
Represented By: Thomas P Frerichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?