Buck et al v. Baus et al
Plaintiff: Amy Buck, Ian Buck, Eric Buck and Jonas Buck
Defendant: Schneider National, Inc, Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc and USAA Casualty Insurance Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: John Baus and Schneider National Carriers, Inc
3Rd Party Defendant: Aaron Lee Barfels, Kyle Anthony Ralston and Jeremy Allen Schmidt
Case Number: 6:2019cv02042
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 26 STATEMENT of No Resistance by Jeremy Allen Schmidt re #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Scheduling Requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) and LR 81(b) in Removed Action (Henry, Douglas) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (des)
August 16, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Crossclaim by Eric Buck, Ian Buck.(Yung, Brian)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Scheduling Requirements. The deadline for submission of a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan is extended to 9/25/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 8/15/2019. (mmc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #8 Third Party Complaint by Aaron Lee Barfels.(Hamann, Timothy)
August 13, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance of Douglas M. Henry, Jenny L. Weiss, and Jessica L. McNamara for Jeremy Allen Schmidt.(Henry, Douglas) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (kms). Modified text on 8/20/2019 (jjh).
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Jeremy Allen Schmidt (Henry, Douglas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #8 Third Party Complaint by Jeremy Allen Schmidt.(Henry, Douglas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Scheduling Requirements by Defendant Schneider National Carriers, Inc (Ogden, Dennis) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (kms).
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. Kyle Anthony Ralston served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Ogden, Dennis)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Aaron Lee Barfels: Responsive pleading due 8/23/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 8/6/2019. (jjh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Aaron Lee Barfels (Hamann, Timothy)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by ThirdParty Defendant Aaron Lee Barfels (Hamann, Timothy)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy W Hamann on behalf of Aaron Lee Barfels. (Hamann, Timothy)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Lloyd Christensen on behalf of Aaron Lee Barfels. (Christensen, Joshua)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. Jeremy Allen Schmidt served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Ogden, Dennis)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Amy Buck, Eric Buck, Ian Buck, Jonas Buck (Henningsen, Pressley)
July 24, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade and Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney no longer assigned to case as presider. (no conflicts identified) (ksy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. Aaron Lee Barfels served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Ogden, Dennis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2019: #2 Summons Page 1, #3 Unredacted Summons Page 1) (ksy).
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Aaron Lee Barfels, Kyle Anthony Ralston, Jeremy Allen Schmidt. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (kms)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 THIRD Party Complaint With Jury Demand against Kyle Anthony Ralston, Jeremy Allen Schmidt, Aaron Lee Barfels, filed by John Baus, Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Ogden, Dennis)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Schneider National Carriers, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Schneider National Inc. for Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Ogden, Dennis)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 DEFENDANTS' Answer With Jury Demand to Complaint of Plaintiffs' and Crossclaim against Eric Buck, Ian Buck by Schneider National Carriers, Inc, John Baus.(Ogden, Dennis) Modified on 7/5/2019 to edit text (src) Modified parties in docket text on 7/24/2019 (des)
June 28, 2019 Set Deadlines: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 7/19/2019. (kms)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation : Please find the Civil Removal Actions New Case Packet attached. (kms)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Schneider National, Inc, Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc, and USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (kms)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition Jury Demand by Amy Buck, Eric Buck, Ian Buck, Jonas Buck. (kms)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 7/29/2019. (kms)
June 28, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Conflicts checked, none found. (kms)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from IOWA DISTRICT COURT FOR BLACK HAWK COUNTY, case number LACV137250. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2970163), filed by JOHN BAUS. Scheduling Report due by 8/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Ogden, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buck et al v. Baus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: John Baus
Represented By: Dennis P Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Schneider National Carriers, Inc
Represented By: Dennis P Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Buck
Represented By: Timothy S Semelroth
Represented By: Benjamin Philip Long
Represented By: Pressley Wade Henningsen
Represented By: Brian C Ivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Buck
Represented By: Timothy S Semelroth
Represented By: Benjamin Philip Long
Represented By: Pressley Wade Henningsen
Represented By: Brian C Ivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Buck
Represented By: Timothy S Semelroth
Represented By: Benjamin Philip Long
Represented By: Pressley Wade Henningsen
Represented By: Brian C Ivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonas Buck
Represented By: Timothy S Semelroth
Represented By: Benjamin Philip Long
Represented By: Pressley Wade Henningsen
Represented By: Brian C Ivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Aaron Lee Barfels
Represented By: Timothy W Hamann
Represented By: Joshua Lloyd Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Kyle Anthony Ralston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jeremy Allen Schmidt
Represented By: Jenny L Weiss
Represented By: Jessica Lee McNamara
Represented By: Douglas M Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National, Inc
Represented By: Dennis P Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc
Represented By: Dennis P Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Dennis P Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?