Ceran v. Sherman
Plaintiff: Lezlie Noel Ceran
Defendant: Stanley Ross Sherman
Case Number: 6:2019cv02066
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 PRO SE MOTION to Amend Summons and Effect Service by US Marshals by Plaintiff Lezlie Noel Ceran. (Attachments: #1 Email Correspondence) (filed as such pursuant to PSLC) (NEF mailed to plaintiff) (des)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Stanley Ross Sherman, filed by Lezlie Noel Ceran.Scheduling Report due by 1/20/2020. NEF mailed to plaintiff, copy mailed to defendant via cert mail. (src)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and denying as moot #2 Motion to File Electronically. The Clerk of Court's Office is directed to file the complaint (Doc. No. #1 ) without prepayment of fees. The Clerk's office is directed to serve, via certified mail, the complaint, a copy of this order, and a waiver of service of summons form on the defendant at the address as listed in the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 10/22/2019. Order/NEF mailed to plaintiff, order/NEF/complaint and waiver mailed to defendant via certified mail. (src) Modified on 10/23/2019 to fix typo (des)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 11/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 AO 85) (ksy)(Copy w/NEF to Plf)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE MOTION for Permission to File Electronically by Plaintiff Lezlie Noel Ceran (ksy)(NEF to PLF)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lezlie Noel Ceran (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksy)(NEF to Plf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceran v. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lezlie Noel Ceran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Ross Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?