Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Dajerabby, Inc et al
Plaintiff: No Surrender Music a division of Praxis International Communications, Inc., Combine Music Corp., Eleksylum Music, Inc., Welsh Witch Music, Rick Springfield Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Broadcast Music Inc, Broken Arrow Music Corporation, No Surrender Music, Eleksylum Music, Inc, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp and Combine Music Corp
Defendant: Dajerabby, Inc. d/b/a Screaming Eagle American Bar & Grill, Ivan Wieland and Dajerabby, Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv02067
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Ivan Wieland Acknowledgement filed by Broadcast Music Inc, Broken Arrow Music Corporation, Combine Music Corp, Eleksylum Music, Inc, No Surrender Music, Rick Springfield Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Welsh Witch Music. (Harty, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Dajerabby, Inc. Acknowledgement filed by Broadcast Music Inc, Broken Arrow Music Corporation, Combine Music Corp, Eleksylum Music, Inc, No Surrender Music, Rick Springfield Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Welsh Witch Music. (Harty, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant Dajerabby, Inc., LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/21/2019. (skm)
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Dajerabby, Inc, Ivan Wieland.(Youngblut, Michael) Modified text on 11/22/2019 (skm).
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Welsh Witch Music (Harty, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp identifying Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Harty, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Rick Springfield Music (Harty, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by No Surrender Music (Harty, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Eleksylum Music, Inc identifying Other Affiliate Elektra/Asylum/Nonesuch Records for Eleksylum Music, Inc. (Harty, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Combine Music Corp identifying Corporate Parent EMI Blackwood Music, Inc. for Combine Music Corp. (Harty, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Broken Arrow Music Corporation. (Harty, Jeffrey) Modified text on 11/15/2019 (skm).
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music Inc. (Harty, Jeffrey) Modified text on 11/15/2019 (skm).
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE re #1 Complaint: AO 121 and Complaint with Exhibit A mailed to Register of Copyrights. (skm)
October 25, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiffs' LR 7.1 Disclosure Statements due by 11/14/2019. (skm)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dajerabby, Inc, Ivan Wieland. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (skm)
October 25, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3048947), filed by Broadcast Music Inc. Scheduling Report deadline 1/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Harty, Jeffrey) Modified text to correct deadline on 10/25/2019 (skm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Dajerabby, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: No Surrender Music a division of Praxis International Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Combine Music Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleksylum Music, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welsh Witch Music
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Springfield Music
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broken Arrow Music Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: No Surrender Music
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleksylum Music, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Combine Music Corp
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dajerabby, Inc. d/b/a Screaming Eagle American Bar & Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Wieland
Represented By: Michael Dale Youngblut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dajerabby, Inc
Represented By: Michael Dale Youngblut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?