Corwin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Carl E. Corwin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2020cv02003
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Ammann Carrington on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Carrington, Melissa)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (jjh)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Carl E Corwin. Dismissal Deadline 5/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjh)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 1/22/2020. (jjh)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 2/21/2020. (ksy)
January 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. No conflicts identified. (ksy)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Carl E. Corwin (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kappelman, Wes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corwin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl E. Corwin
Represented By: Hugh M Field
Represented By: Wes Kappelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?