Horton v. City of Waterloo et al
Plaintiff: Nanette Horton
Defendant: City of Waterloo, Waterloo Police Department, Black Hawk County Sheriff, Waterloo, Iowa, City of and Iowa, State of
Case Number: 6:2020cv02011
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Nanette Horton. (NEF mailed to plaintiff) (pac) (Main Document 10 replaced and additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2020: #1 Unredacted Motion) (jjh).
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 PRO SE SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Nanette Horton. (NEF mailed to plaintiff) (pac) (Main Document 9 replaced on 4/7/2020 to redact personal identifier) (pac). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2020: #1 Unredacted Supplement) (pac).
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 Correspondence by Nanette Horton. (NEF mailed to Pltf per PSLC) (jjh) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/3/2020) (jjh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2020: #1 Unredacted Corresp) (jjh).
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 PRO SE AMENDED Complaint against Black Hawk County Sheriff, Iowa, State of, Waterloo Police Department, Waterloo, Iowa, City of, filed by Nanette Horton. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Amended Complaint) (NEF mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Nanette Horton which included #3 Order and #4 Case Transferred NEF. Unable to forward. (jjh)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order: Plaintiff has thirty days from the date of this order to either pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis which complies with the requirements of 1915. The Clerk of Court's Office is directed to send Horton the standard in forma pauperis form. If Horton does not file a motion within thirty days, this case will be dismissed with no further order of the court. Additionally, because the plaintiff has not named any appropriate defendants and her current filing does not plainly state her claim(s), the Clerk of Court's Office is directed to send plaintiff a copy of the standard 1983 form. Plaintiff is given thirty days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint using the provided form. If the plaintiff does not file an amended complaint within thirty days, her case will be dismissed with no further order from the court. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 2/26/2020. (copy w/NEF, IFP, and 1983 forms mailed to Plf) (jag)
February 20, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00057. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE (NEF w/copy of #3 Order mailed to Pltf) Modified on 2/20/2020 (jjh).
February 19, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. File electronically sent to the Northern District of Iowa. Copy of NEF (1) and Order (2) mailed to Plaintiff Nanette Horton P.O. Box 182, Muscatine IA 52761 (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 2/19/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Iowa.. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 2/19/2020. (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 2/19/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Sealed Document by Nanette Horton. (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 2/19/2020.] (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/21/2020) (des).
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nanette Horton. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/19/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/19/2020. (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 2/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton v. City of Waterloo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanette Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Waterloo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterloo Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Hawk County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterloo, Iowa, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?